Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1223527

EP1223527 - E-mail service provider and method for filtering unsolicited e-mail [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.11.2006  [2006/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2002/29]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Cooper, Gerald M.
Gretna, Virginia / US
 [2002/29]
Representative(s)Stenborg, Anders Vilhelm , et al
Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544
751 45 Uppsala / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Stenborg, Anders Vilhelm , et al
Aros Patent AB, P.O. Box 1544
751 45 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date01850227.827.12.2001
[2002/29]
Priority number, dateUS2001076093515.01.2001         Original published format: US 760935
[2002/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1223527
Date:17.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1223527
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2002/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/29]
TitleGerman:E-Mail Dienstanbieter und Verfahren zum Filtern von unerwünchster E-Mail[2002/29]
English:E-mail service provider and method for filtering unsolicited e-mail[2002/29]
French:Fournisseur de services de courrier électronique et procédé pour le filtrage de courrier électronique non sollicité[2002/29]
Examination procedure18.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/47]
03.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5930479  (HALL ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0010288  (OMNIPOINT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0899918  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0946022  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2343529  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]  HALL R J, "HOW TO AVOID UNWANTED EMAIL", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, US, (19980301), vol. 41, no. 3, ISSN 0001-0782, pages 88 - 95, XP000767817 [X] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/272287.272329
 [A]  GOLDBERG I ET AL, "PRIVACY-ENHANCING TECHNOLOGIES FOR THE INTERNET", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE COMPCON '97. SAN JOSE, FEB. 23 - 26, 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19970223), ISBN 0-8186-7805-4, pages 103 - 109, XP000751768 [A] * the whole document *