Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1233383

EP1233383 - Method and device for the management of IC-card applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BANKSYS S.A.
1442, Chaussée de Haecht
1130 Bruxelles / BE
[2002/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Slinckx, René
Clos du Meunier, 7
1970 Wezembeek Oppem / BE
 [2002/34]
Representative(s)Claeys, Pierre , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]Claeys, Pierre , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7
1060 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date01870027.814.02.2001
[2002/34]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1233383
Date:21.08.2002
Language:FR
[2002/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10
[2002/34]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/20]
Former [2002/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verwalten von Chipkartenanwendungen[2002/34]
English:Method and device for the management of IC-card applications[2002/34]
French:Procédé et dispositif de gestion d'applications de cartes à puce[2002/34]
Examination procedure22.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
23.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0717381  (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 5, line 26 - column 7, line 11 *;
 [Y]FR2657445  (GEMPLUS CARD INTERNATIONAL) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 5, line 3 - line 21 *;
 [Y]EP0193920  (CASIO COMPUTER COMPANY) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - line 65 * * column 6, line 8 - line 36 *;
 [A]DE3435697  (ROBERT BOSCH) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0626664  (GEMPLUS CARD INTERNATIONAL) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0723240  (FRANCE TELECOM);
 [A]EP0707290  (CP8 TRANSAC) [A] * page 17 *;
 [A]EP0490455  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS)