EP1244050 - Process and device for saving of applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROTON WORLD INTERNATIONAL en abrégé PWI Excelsiorlaan 44-46 1930 Zaventem / BE | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states PROTON WORLD INTERNATIONAL en abrégé PWI Excelsioorlaan 44-46 1930 Zaventem / BE | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states PROTON WORLD INTERNATIONAL en abrégé PWI rue du Planeur 10 1130 Bruxelles (Haren) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Assche, Gilles Rue des Chardons 40 1030 Bruxelles / BE | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Yvon, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Schmitz, Yvon, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 01870059.1 | 23.03.2001 | [2002/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244050 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244050 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G07F7/08 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06K7/0008 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/355 (EP);
G06Q20/3552 (EP);
G06Q20/4097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abspeicherung von Anwendungsprogrammen | [2002/39] | English: | Process and device for saving of applications | [2002/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de sauvegarde d'applications | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 21.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2009 | CY | 28.01.2009 | DK | 28.01.2009 | FI | 28.01.2009 | IE | 28.01.2009 | IT | 28.01.2009 | NL | 28.01.2009 | TR | 28.01.2009 | LU | 23.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | GB | 28.04.2009 | SE | 28.04.2009 | GR | 29.04.2009 | ES | 09.05.2009 | PT | 29.06.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
IT | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
LU | 23.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
IT | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 28.01.2009 | |
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 28.01.2009 | |
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 28.01.2009 | |
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | ES | 09.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4877947 (MORI TORU [JP]) [X] 1,10 * abstract *; | [YA]GB2282683 (GEN INFORMATION SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 6-9 * page 8, line 10 - line 25; figure 2 * [A] 1,10; | [A]US5434395 (STORCK JEAN R [FR], et al) [A] 1,10* abstract *; | [XY]EP0854454 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 7, line 10 - column 10, line 7; figure 6 * [Y] 6-9 |