EP1168422 - Method and apparatus for liquid-treating and drying a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2009/33] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states INTERUNIVERSITAIRE MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mertens, Paul Dijleweg 30A 2820 Bonheiden / BE | 02 /
Meuris, Marc D. Liekenslaan 27 3140 Keerbergen / BE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01870138.3 | 26.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | US20000214693P | 27.06.2000 Original published format: US 214693 P | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168422 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168422 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168422 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, B08B7/04, B05D3/04, F26B3/04 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/67057 (EP,US);
B08B3/04 (EP,US);
F26B13/10 (EP,US);
F26B13/28 (EP,US);
H01L21/67028 (EP,US);
Y10S134/902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen und Trocknen eines Substrats | [2002/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for liquid-treating and drying a substrate | [2002/01] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour nettoyer et sécher un substrat | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2009 | BE | 16.12.2009 | CY | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IT | 16.12.2009 | NL | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | GR | 17.03.2010 | ES | 27.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | IE | 26.06.2010 | LU | 26.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
LU | 26.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10189528 ; | [X]US3865298 (ALLEN TRAVIS A, et al) [X] 1-23 * column 2, line 29 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]US4569695 (YAMASHITA HIROMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 6, line 1 - line 35; figure 5 *; | [XA]US5714203 (SCHELLENBERGER WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 38 - line 58; figure 1 *[A] 10-23 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10189528 A 19980721 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-23 * abstract * |