Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1186265

EP1186265 - Panel for transporting and displaying goods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vandewiele, José
Stationsstraat 73
8790 Waregem / BE
[2003/39]
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
Vandewiele, José
Stationsstraat 73
8790 Waregem / BE
For all designated states
Vanhie, Jan
Kerkplein 5
8880 Sint-Eloois-Winkel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Vandewiele, José
Stationsstraat 73
8790 Waregem / BE
02 / Vanhie, Jan
Kerkplein 5
8880 Sint-Eloois-Winkel / BE
 [2003/39]
Former [2002/11]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/11]Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Livornostraat 7
1060 Brussel / BE
Application number, filing date01870195.312.09.2001
[2002/11]
Priority number, dateEP2000087019912.09.2000         Original published format: EP 00870199
[2002/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1186265
Date:13.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1186265
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47F3/14, A47F7/00
[2002/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/11]
TitleGerman:Paneel zum Transportieren und Präsentieren von Waren[2002/11]
English:Panel for transporting and displaying goods[2002/11]
French:Panneau pour le transport et la présentation de marchandises[2002/11]
Examination procedure05.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
29.10.2003Observations by third parties
09.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
06.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6105797  (HAISMA ROMKA [AU]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 3, line 7 - line 13; figure - *;
 [A]DE9214829U  (FRANZ KAHLER TRANSPORTGERÄTEBAU) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4890748  (VISSER JOHN G [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 46; figures 1,9,15 *
otherWO9710984
 US4890748
    VAN DER DUSSEN P., "Longer Shelf Life", CANADIAN FLORIST GREENHOUSE & NURSERY, (199601), vol. 91, no. 1, page 28, XP002969037