blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1162405

EP1162405 - Device for the combustion of renewable particle fuels, in particular wood pellets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 26.04.2006  [2006/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seebacher, Theodor Ernst
Waidach 148
5421 Adnet / AT
[2001/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Hübscher, Helmut, et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher
Postfach 411
4010 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Spittelwiese 7
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date01890170.201.06.2001
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateAT2000000097605.06.2000         Original published format: AT 9762000
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162405
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1162405
Date:27.03.2002
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:F23G7/10, F23K3/02, F23D1/00, F23C9/06
[2002/13]
CPC:
F23G7/105 (EP); F23C9/006 (EP); F23D1/00 (EP);
F23G5/033 (EP); F23L5/02 (EP); F23G2201/80 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/50]F23G7/10, F23K3/02, F23D1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/50]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Verbrennen von nachwachsenden, stückeligen Brennstoffen, insbesondere Holzpellets[2001/50]
English:Device for the combustion of renewable particle fuels, in particular wood pellets[2001/50]
French:Dispositif de combustion pour combustibles renouvelables granulés, notamment boulettes de bois[2001/50]
Examination procedure26.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
04.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/17]
04.12.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200303   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2003
30.06.200404   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0029150  (BUDERUS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 5, line 11 - line 25 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [Y]DE1451574  (GROSSTUECK WERNER) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 6 - line 15 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR1119366  (RICARDO & CO ENGINEERS) [A] 1 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 1, column 2, line 30 - page 2, column 2, line 22 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE372705  (PFEIFFER GEB, et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE121320  (WILLIAMS PATENT CRUSHER AND PULVERIZER COMPANY) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB160155  (UTILISATION DES COMBUSTIBLES P) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0213512
 DE4312902
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.