Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164220

EP1164220 - Surface treatment of coating base paper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.05.2003  [2003/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
M-real Hallein AG
Salzachtal Bundesstrasse Süd 88
5400 Hallein / AT
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Gliese, Thoralf Dr.
Furtmühlstrasse 24 a
5101 Bergheim / AT
02 / Kainz, Friedrich
Vigaun 177
5424 Vigaun / AT
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Häupl, Armin
Patentanwälte
Mariahilferstrasse 50
1070 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Häupl, Armin, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Mariahilferstrasse 50
1070 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date01890185.013.06.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateAT2000000104916.06.2000         Original published format: AT 10492000
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1164220
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:D21H17/26, D21H23/26
[2001/51]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/37]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Oberflächenbehandlung von Streichrohpapier[2001/51]
English:Surface treatment of coating base paper[2001/51]
French:Traitement de surface de papier support de couche[2001/51]
Examination procedure20.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/19]
21.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/19]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.08.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.08.2002M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP0455073  (AQUALON CO [US]) [DX] 1 * page 2, line 20 - line 24 *;
 JPS5891893  [ ] (SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP CO);
 [DA]DE19503745  (SCHOELLER FELIX JUN FOTO [DE])
 [X]  - J. P. CASEY, Pulp and Paper; Chemistry and Chemical Technology, dritte Auflage, Band III, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1981), XP002175462 [X] 1-4 * page 1698 - page 1700; figures 20-1; tables 20-7 *
 [X]  - MAKHONIN, A. G., "Use of Size Presses Is an Effective Method for Improving Properties of Paper and Board", DATABASE PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US, URL: DIALOG, XP002175463 [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *
    [] - BUM. PROMST. NO. 5: 13-14 (MAY 1990). [RUSS.],
 [X]  - MAKHONIN, A. G. ET AL, "Influence of Surface Sizing on Paper Structure", DATABASE PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US, URL: DIALOG, XP002175464 [X] 1,3 * abstract *
    [] - MEZHVUZ. SB. NAUCH. TR., SER. KHIM. MEKH. PERERAB. DREV. I DREV. OTKHODOV (KIPRIANOV, A. I., ED.) NO. 6: 46-52 (1980 LENINGRAD). [RUSS.],
 [X]  - MAKHONIN, A. G. ET AL, "Surface Sizing of Letterpress Paper", DATABASE PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US, URL: DIALOG, XP002175465 [X] 1-4 * abstract *
    [] - MEZHVUZ. SB. NAUCH. TR., SER. KHIM. MEKH. PERERAB. DREV. I DREV. OTKHODOV (KIPRIANOV, A. I., ED.) NO. 6: 119-125 (1980 LENINGRAD). [RUSS.],
 [X]  - MAKHONIN, A. G. ET AL, "Use of Size Presses in the Paper Industry", DATABASE PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US, URL: DIALOG, XP002175466 [X] 1,4 * abstract *
    [] - MEZHVUZ. SB. NAUCH. TR., KHIM. TEKHNOL. TSELLYUL. (NEPENIN, YU. N., ET AL., ED.) NO. 7: 18-20 (1980 LENINGRAD). [RUSS.],
 [X]  - MITSYK, T. E. ET AL, "Effective Substitute for Starch in the Production of Technical Types of Paper", DATABASE PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US, URL: DIALOG, XP002175467 [X] 1-4 * abstract *
    [] - BUMAZH. PROM. NO. 7: 13-14 (JULY 1984). [RUSS.],
 [X]  - YAMAMOTO, M. ET AL, "Surface Sizing Paper", DATABASE PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US, URL: DIALOG, XP002175468 [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATT, P.-E, "SURFACE SIZING WITH CARBOXYMETHYL CELLULOSE USING A BLADE COATER", DATABASE PAPERCHEM, THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ATLANTA, GA, US, URL: DIALOG, XP002175469 [X] 1,4 * abstract *
    [] - EUCEPA SYMP. CHEMISTRY IN PAPERMAKING (WARSAW): 244-261 (SEPT. 1978).,