Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1167479

EP1167479 - Underwater application of a paint [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lestin & Co. Tauch- Bergungs- und Sprengunternehmen Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Nikolsdorfer Gasse 31
1050 Wien / AT
[2002/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Federspiel, Per G., Mag. Dr.
Anreitergasse 7
1230 Wien / AT
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Wildhack, Helmut
Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50
1030 Wien / AT
[2009/31]
Former [2002/01]Wildhack, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Wildhack-Jellinek, Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50
1030 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date01890193.421.06.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateAT2000000107921.06.2000         Original published format: AT 10792000
[2002/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1167479
Date:02.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1167479
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1167479
Date:22.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:C09D163/00, C09D5/00, C08G59/18, C08G59/50
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/01]
TitleGerman:Anstrichmittel für Unterwasser-Anwendung[2002/01]
English:Underwater application of a paint[2002/01]
French:Peinture pour application sous-marine[2002/01]
Examination procedure19.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
21.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2004Fee for grant paid
17.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
PT22.02.2005
AT21.06.2005
CY21.06.2005
LU21.06.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/26]FI22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
AT21.06.2005
CY21.06.2005
LU21.06.2005
Former [2007/20]FI22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
AT21.06.2005
CY21.06.2005
Former [2006/51]FI22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
AT21.06.2005
Former [2006/43]FI22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
AT21.06.2005
Former [2005/46]FI22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US4022946  (CUMMINGS LOWELL O) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]JPS55144053
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810130), vol. 005, no. 016, Database accession no. (C - 041), [A] 1 * abstract *