Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318299

EP1318299 - Bulb turbine-generator unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VA TECH HYDRO GmbH & Co.
Penzinger Strasse 76
1140 Wien / AT
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Duflon, Pierre
6 rue Pierre et Marie Curie
38120 St-Egrève / FR
02 / Fonkenell, Jacques
75 rue Parmentier
38140 Izeaux / FR
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co
Penzinger Strasse 76
1141 Wien / AT
[2003/42]
Former [2003/40](deleted)
...
Former [2003/24]Rieberer, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing.
VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Penzinger Strasse 76
1141 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date01890333.607.12.2001
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318299
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:F03B13/10, H02K21/12
[2003/24]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/10]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Turbinenrohrgeneratoreinheit[2003/24]
English:Bulb turbine-generator unit[2003/24]
French:Groupe générateur bulbe à turbine[2003/24]
Examination procedure12.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/40]
27.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
02.02.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.02.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6231407  (HEIN PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5-7,9-11;
 [X]DE19902837  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,8 * column 4, line 8 - column 4, line 48; claim 10 *;
 [Y]US3936681  (LIEBE WOLFGANG) [Y] 2,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - column 3, line 9; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]FR1307426  (FISCHER ARNO) [Y] 5,6 * page 2, column 2, line 6 - page 2, column 2, line 62; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0490846  (FLYGT AB ITT [SE]) [Y] 7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6146096  (WINKLER STEFAN [AT]) [Y] 9-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - column 2, line 65 *;
 [A]WO9220134  (ELIN ENERGIEVERSORGUNG [AT]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [X]  SIEMENS-SCHOTTEL-PROPULSOR (SSP) THE PODDED ELECTRIC DRIVE WITH PERMANENTLY EXCITED MOTOR, (19970307), pages A - B,1-24, XP000198528 [X] 1,3,8 * page 8 - page 10 *