Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1250138

EP1250138 - FULVESTRANT FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2002/43]
Inventor(s)01 / EVANS, John, Raymond
Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
02 / GRUNDY, Rosalind, Ursula
Alderley Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
 [2002/43]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/28]
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2002/43]Giles, Allen Frank , et al
AstraZeneca AB, Global Intellectual Property
151 85 Sodertalje / SE
Application number, filing date01900186.608.01.2001
[2002/43]
WO2001GB00049
Priority number, dateGB2000000031310.01.2000         Original published format: GB 0000313
GB2000000883712.04.2000         Original published format: GB 0008837
[2002/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0151056
Date:19.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1250138
Date:23.10.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001
[2002/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1250138
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1250138
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/565, A61P35/00, A61K47/14, A61K47/44
[2002/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/28]
Former [2002/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesAL12.08.2002
LT12.08.2002
LV12.08.2002
MK12.08.2002
RO12.08.2002
SI12.08.2002
TitleGerman:FULVESTRANT FORMULIERUNG[2002/43]
English:FULVESTRANT FORMULATION[2002/43]
French:PREPARATION DE FULVESTRANT[2002/43]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2002National basic fee paid 
12.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
03.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2005Fee for grant paid
28.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.05.2008Observations by third parties
02.02.2015Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP05016921.8  / EP1669073
EP10180661.0  / EP2286818
EP10180667.7  / EP2266573
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006  30.12.2014  WITHDRAWN
Gedeon Richter Ltd.
P.O. Box 27
1475 Budapest 10 / HU
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006  30.12.2014  WITHDRAWN
Gedeon Richter Ltd.
P.O. Box 27
1475 Budapest 10 / HU
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2015/08]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006  30.12.2014  WITHDRAWN
Gedeon Richter Ltd.
P.O. Box 27
1475 Budapest 10 / HU
Opponent's representative
Tauchner, Paul, et al
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2008/36]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006  27.07.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Gedeon Richter Ltd.
P.O. Box 27
1475 Budapest 10 / HU
Opponent's representative
Tauchner, Paul, et al
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2006/35]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006  27.07.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Gedeon Richter Ltd.
P.O. Box 27
1475 Budapest 10 / HU
Opponent's representative
Tauchner, Paul, et al
Vossius & Partner, Siebertstrasse 3
81675 Munich / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.08.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2008Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
29.01.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2015
03.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
11.02.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.02.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.05.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.05.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition04.02.2009Appeal received No.  T0336/09
07.04.2009Statement of grounds filed
15.12.2011Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M09) [2011/51]
18.03.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
12.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
18.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
24.03.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
[2018/36]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0346014  (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-23 * page 9; example 3 *;
 [A]WO9619997  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * claims 1,5,6,8 * * page 16; example 5 *;
 [A]WO9721440  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * claims 1,6 * * examples 1,3,4 *;
 [A]  - JOHN C. WATERTON; ET AL., "A Case of Adenomyosis in a Pigtailed Monkey Diagnosed by Magnetic Resonance Imaging and treated with the Novel Pure Antiestrogen, ICI 182,780", LABORATORY ANIMAL SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 247 - 251, XP000998289 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
other   - RIFFKIN C. ET AL., "CASTOR OIL AS A VEHICLE FOR PARENTERAL ADMINISTRATION OF STEROID HORMONES", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1964), vol. 53, pages 891 - 895, XP009094139

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600530809
OppositionEP0346014
 EP0310542
 US3164520
    - C. RIFFKIN ET AL., "Castor Oil as a Vehicle for Parenteral Administration of Steroid Hormones", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1964), vol. 53, no. 8, pages 891 - 895
    - J.F.R. ROBERTSON ET AL., "Pharmacokinetic Profile of Intramuscular Fulvestrant in Advanced Breast Cancer", CLIN. PHARMACOKINET, (2004), vol. 43, no. 8, pages 529 - 538
    - S. MCLESKEY ET AL., "Tamoxifen-resistant Fibroblast Growth Factor-transfered MCF-7 Cells Are Cross-Resistant in Vivo to the Antiestrogen ICI 182,780 and Two Aromatase Inhibitors", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (199803), vol. 4, pages 697 - 711
    - A. HOWELL ET AL., "Pharmacokinetics, pharmacological and anti-tumour effects of the specific anti-oestrogen ICI 182780 in women with advanced breast cancer", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1996), vol. 74, pages 300 - 308
    - A. HOWELL ET AL., "Response to a specific antioestrogen (ICI 182780) in tamoxifen-resistant breast cancer", THE LANCET, (19950107), vol. 345, pages 29 - 30
    - M. DUKES ET AL., "Antiuterotrophic effects of a pure antioestrogen, ICI 182,780: magnetic resonance imaging of the uterus in ovariectomized monkeys", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 135, pages 239 - 247
    - M. DUKES ET AL., "Antiuterotrophic effects of the pure antioestrogen ICI 182,780 in adult female monkeys (Macaca nemestrina): quantitative magnetic resonance imaging", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 138, pages 203 - 209
    - R. M. O'REGAN ET AL., "Effects of the Antiestrogens Tamoxifen, Toremifene, and ICI 182,780 on Endometrial Cancer Growth", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (19981021), vol. 90, no. 20, pages 1552 - 1558
    - Third party observation filed 24 January 2013 with letter dated 22 January 2013
    - A. HOWELL ET AL., "ICI 182,780 (Faslodex TM) Development of a Novel, "Pure" Antiestrogen", AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, (2000), vol. 89, pages 817 - 825
    - J. ROBERTSON ET AL., "The anti-tumor effects of single dose, long acting Faslodex TM (ICI182780) compared with Tamoxifen in post-menopausal primary breast cancer patients treated before surgery, Breast Cancer Research and Treatment 59, 2000, 99", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (2000), vol. 57, no. 1