Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1250680

EP1250680 - OPTICAL SECURITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolic AG
Chamerstrasse 50
6301 Zug / CH
[2002/43]
Inventor(s)01 / MOIA, Franco
Eggstrasse 24a
CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH
 [2002/43]
Representative(s)Liebetanz, Michael , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/43]Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date01900370.625.01.2001
[2002/43]
WO2001CH00058
Priority number, dateEP2000030061027.01.2000         Original published format: EP 00300610
[2002/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0155960
Date:02.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1250680
Date:23.10.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1250680
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/06, B42D15/10
[2002/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES SICHERHEITSGERÄT[2002/43]
English:OPTICAL SECURITY DEVICE[2002/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE OPTIQUE[2002/43]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2002National basic fee paid 
20.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
03.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2006Fee for grant paid
01.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CY13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
TR13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IE25.01.2007
LU25.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CY13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IE25.01.2007
LU25.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
Former [2008/19]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IE25.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/48]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IE25.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/37]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/36]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/28]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/26]FI13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/21]FI13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
Former [2007/09]FI13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9852077  (ROLIC AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-22 * page 8, line 24 - page 23, line 23 *;
 [DA]EP0689065  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DA] 1-22 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 28 *;
 [A]EP0911758  (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-22 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 30; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0899119  (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 6 *
ExaminationWO0029878
    - GB 9825023.6 APPLICATION