Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258118

EP1258118 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DATA AND TIMING RECOVERY IN A BI-PHASE CODED DATA SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG
Mühldorfstrasse 15
81671 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG
Mühldorfstrasse 15
D-81671 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Peter
Therese-Giehse-Allee 83
81739 München / DE
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Körfer, Thomas , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date01900458.916.01.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001EP00437
Priority number, dateDE200010778321.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10007783
[2002/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0163865
Date:30.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258118
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258118
Date:28.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/49
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DATEN- UND TAKTRÜCKGEWINNUNG BEI EINEM BIPHASE-CODIERTEN DATENSIGNAL[2002/47]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DATA AND TIMING RECOVERY IN A BI-PHASE CODED DATA SIGNAL[2002/47]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA RECUPERATION DE RYTHMES ET DE DONNEES SUR UN SIGNAL DE DONNEES CODE BIPHASE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2002National basic fee paid 
26.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
20.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2004Fee for grant paid
25.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI28.04.2004
IE28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
TR28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
PT28.09.2004
CY16.01.2005
LU16.01.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/20]FI28.04.2004
IE28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
TR28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
CY16.01.2005
LU16.01.2005
Former [2007/09]FI28.04.2004
IE28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
TR28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
LU16.01.2005
Former [2006/51]FI28.04.2004
IE28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
TR28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
Former [2006/13]FI28.04.2004
IE28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
Former [2005/19]FI28.04.2004
IE28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
Former [2005/06]FI28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI28.04.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE4408963  (INST RUNDFUNKTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 33 - line 36 * * page 2, column 2, line 15 - line 32 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]US5953386  (ANDERSON MICHAEL B [US]) [Y] 3 * page 15, column 1, line 44 - line 51 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]  - HOOIJMANS P W ET AL, "PENALTY FREE BIPHASE LINECODING FOR PATTERN INDEPENDENT FSK COHERENT TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, NEW YORK, US, (19900301), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 323 - 326, XP000136398 [A] 1-3,5 * page 325, column 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 328, column 1, line 18 - line 25 * * page 325, column 2, line 37 - line 55 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.50729