Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254318

EP1254318 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING FLUID FROM A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 28.02.2007  [2007/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HYDAC TECHNOLOGY GMBH
Industriestrasse
D-66280 Sulzbach / DE
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / BALTES, Herbert
Bornstrasse 22
66679 Losheim / DE
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur
Patentanwälte
Bartels und Partner
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur
Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner, Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01900471.219.01.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001EP00608
Priority number, dateDE200010601411.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10006014
US2000051438828.02.2000         Original published format: US 514388
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0159308
Date:16.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254318
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254318
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F15B21/04, F17C1/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON FLUID AUS EINEM BEHÄLTER[2002/45]
English:DEVICE FOR REMOVING FLUID FROM A CONTAINER[2002/45]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR L'ELIMINATION D'UN FLUIDE HORS D'UN RESERVOIR[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2002National basic fee paid 
13.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
12.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2003Fee for grant paid
10.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.06.2003
FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
TR04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
BE31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
[2007/09]
Former [2006/51]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
TR04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
BE31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/14]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
BE31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/02]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
MC31.01.2004
Former [2004/29]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/15]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/10]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/03]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE29722504U  (FAUSTMANN HANS ERICH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-19 * [A] 3-7;
 [XA]LU39909  (DHUR, A.) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraphs 2-4 * [A] 3-7;
 [X]US3687176  (FERNANDES JOSEPH F, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 5, line 5 *;
 [A]DE19547245  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-7 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 19 *;
 [A]US4080996  (ZAHID ABDUZ) [A] 2-4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4304526  (SHETLER SR EARL B) [A] 1,2 * figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US4425698  (PETRIE IVAN L [US]) [A] 2-4 * abstract *