Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161012

EP1161012 - INTERFERENCE SIGNAL ELIMINATING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF ELIMINATING INTERFERENCE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Change - designated statespublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYOSHI, Kenichi
1-240-1-501, Mutsukawa Minami-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 232-0066 / JP
02 / MIYA, Kazuyuki
5-26-25, Kamiasao, Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0021 / JP
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01900642.810.01.2001
[2001/49]
WO2001JP00064
Priority number, dateJP2000000926818.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000009268
[2001/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154329
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161012
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04J13/04, H04B7/26, H04B1/707
[2002/37]
Former International [2001/49]H04J13/04, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON STÖRSIGNALEN[2001/49]
English:INTERFERENCE SIGNAL ELIMINATING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF ELIMINATING INTERFERENCE SIGNAL[2001/49]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SUPPRESSION DES SIGNAUX D'INTERFERENCE[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2001Translation filed 
17.09.2001National basic fee paid 
17.09.2001Search fee paid 
17.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
13.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/39]
28.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0814581  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 7, line 37 *
 [PX]  KUAN E L ET AL, "COMPARATIVE STUDY OF ADAPTIVE-RATE CDMA TRANSMISSION EMPLOYING JOINT-DETECTION AND INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION RECEIVERS", VTC 2000-SPRING. 2000 IEEE 51ST. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TOKYO, JAPAN, MAY 15-18, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000515), vol. 1 OF 3. CONF. 51, ISBN 0-7803-5719-1, pages 71 - 75, XP000970582 [PX] 1-10 * abstract * * page 72, column L - page 72, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 73, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *
 [PX]  HAN S H ET AL, "PERFORMANCE OF MULTI-RATE DS-CDMA SYSTEM WITH MULTI-STAGE PARTIAL PARALLEL INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION", VTC 2000-SPRING. 2000 IEEE 51ST. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TOKYO, JAPAN, MAY 15-18, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000515), vol. 2 OF 3. CONF. 51, ISBN 0-7803-5719-1, pages 765 - 769, XP000967973 [PX] 1-10 * abstract * * page 765, column R, paragraph 1 - page 766, column R, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  MADKOUR M F ET AL, "A subspace projection based blind interference cancellation scheme for W-CDMA downlink", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTERS, 1999. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY-THIRD ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON OCT. 24-27, 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), ISBN 0-7803-5700-0, pages 1611 - 1615, XP010373902 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1613, column R, paragraph 1 - column L, line 41 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1999.832020
 [X]  HWANG S H ET AL, "Interference cancellation schemes for a dual-rate variable processing gain DS/CDMA system", 1997 IEEE 6TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS RECORD. SAN DIEGO, 12 - 16. OCT. 1997, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19971012), vol. 2 CONF. 6, ISBN 0-7803-3777-8, pages 465 - 469, XP010248753 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 466, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICUPC.1997.627208
 [Y]  ALAM M ET AL, "NEAR-FAR RESISTANCE OF PARALLEL INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION DETECTOR IN A MULTIRATE DS-CDMA SYSTEMS", VTC 1999-FALL. IEEE VTS 50TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. GATEWAY TO THE 21ST. CENTURY COMMUNICATIONS VILLAGE. AMSTERDAM, SEPT. 19 - 22, 1999, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19990919), vol. 3 CONF. 50, ISBN 0-7803-5436-2, pages 1830 - 1834, XP000922423 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1830, column R - page 1831, column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.1999.801713
 [Y]  JUNTTI M J, "PERFORMANCE OF MULTIUSER DETECTION IN MULTIRATE CDMA SYSTEMS", WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, (199912), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0929-6212, pages 293 - 311, XP000860502 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 294, paragraph 1 - page 296, paragraph 2 * * page 305, paragraph 1 - page 306, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018628807970
International search[A]JPH1117646  (NEC CORP);
 [A]JPH11298443  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH11150522  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]  - YUKIHIKO OKUMURA ET AL., "DS-CDMA ni okeru kaisouteki chokkou fugou keiretsu wo mochiita blind kahen rate data densou", TECHNICAL RESEARCH REPORT OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEER, (19971016), vol. 97, no. 322, pages 7 - 13, RCS97-114, XP002938934