Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258298

EP1258298 - Measuring device for a blank processing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/47]SHEET WORKING METHOD, SHEET WORKING SYSTEM, AND VARIOUS DEVICES RELATED TO SUCH SYSTEM
[2007/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2009
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.04.2009  [2009/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMADA COMPANY, Ltd.
200, Ishida Isehara-shi
Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP
[2008/17]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Amada Company, Ltd.
200, Ishida
Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOYAMA, Junichi
722-8, Yokono
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 259-1307 / JP
02 / OMATA, Hitoshi
1615-5 Yoshidajima, Kaiseimachi
Ashigarakamigun, Kanagawa 258-0021 / JP
03 / HAYAMA, Osamu
628-7, Goudo
Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1138 / JP
04 / IMAI, Kazunari
19-8, Hane
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 259-1301 / JP
05 / TAKEHARA, Tokuro
62-15, Horinishi
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 259-1331 / JP
06 / ANZAI, Tetsuya
750-8, Kamikasuya
Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1141 / JP
 [2003/02]
Former [2002/47]01 / KOYAMA, Junichi
722-8, Yokono
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 259-1307 / JP
02 / OMATA, Hitoshi
876-1, Kaneko, Ooimachi
Ashigarakamigun, Kanagawa 258-0019 / JP
03 / HAYAMA, Osamu
628-7, Goudo
Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1138 / JP
04 / IMAI, Kazunari
19-8, Hane
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 259-1301 / JP
05 / TAKEHARA, Tokuro
62-15, Horinishi
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 259-1331 / JP
06 / ANZAI, Tetsuya
750-8, Kamikasuya
Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1141 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/47]Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01900781.416.01.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001JP00220
Priority number, dateJP2000000828317.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000008283
JP2000037483808.12.2000         Original published format: JP 2000374838
[2002/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0153017
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258298
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258298
Date:23.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:B21D5/02
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Messeinrichtung für eine, einen Zuschnitt bearbeitende Maschine[2007/31]
English:Measuring device for a blank processing machine[2007/31]
French:Dispositif de mesure pour une machine à travailler des ébauches[2007/37]
Former [2002/47]MATREIALBEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND VERSCHIEDENE GERÄTE DAFÜR
Former [2002/47]SHEET WORKING METHOD, SHEET WORKING SYSTEM, AND VARIOUS DEVICES RELATED TO SUCH SYSTEM
Former [2002/47]PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'USINAGE DE TOLES, ET EQUIPEMENTS ASSOCIES
Entry into regional phase12.08.2002Translation filed 
12.08.2002National basic fee paid 
12.08.2002Search fee paid 
12.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
21.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2008Fee for grant paid
07.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08004408.4  / EP1925375
Opposition(s)26.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JP2891363B  ;
 [A]JPH0230327  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [A]JP2508011Y
Examination JPH04279219
  US5842366