Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254118

EP1254118 - SUBSTITUTED 1,2,3,4- TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE-2-CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grünenthal GmbH
Zieglerstrasse 6
52078 Aachen / DE
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / GERLACH, Matthias
Pfarrgasse 1
63636 Brachttal / DE
02 / PRZEWOSNY, Michael
Suermondtplatz 3
52062 Aachen / DE
03 / ENGLBERGER, Werner
Sonnenweg 1
52223 Stolberg / DE
04 / REISSMÜLLER, Elke
Astastrasse 36
33617 Bielefeld / DE
05 / BLOMS-FUNKE, Petra
Scherberger Strasse 5
52146 Würselen / DE
06 / MAUL, Corinna
Oppenhoffallee 83-85
52066 Aachen / DE
07 / JAGUSCH, Utz-Peter
Bismarckstrasse 161
52066 Aachen / DE
 [2002/45]
Application number, filing date01901176.619.01.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001EP00588
Priority number, dateDE200010530207.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10005302
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0158875
Date:16.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254118
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254118
Date:09.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D215/48, A61K31/47, A61P25/32, C07D221/16, C07D221/22, C07D491/04, C07D495/04
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LT12.08.2002
LV12.08.2002
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SI12.08.2002
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROCHINOLIN-2-CARBONSÄUREDERIVATE[2002/45]
English:SUBSTITUTED 1,2,3,4- TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE-2-CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES[2002/45]
French:DERIVES SUBSTITUES D'ACIDE 1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE-2-CARBOXYLIQUE[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2002National basic fee paid 
12.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
13.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2005Fee for grant paid
23.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/36]IT09.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0386839  (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB]) [DX] 1-5,7-11,13,23-25 * Seite 2, Formel 1 * * page 2, line 1 - line 7 *;
 [X]WO9964411  (GLAXO WELLCOME SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13,23-25 * page 1, line 3 - line 15 * * Seite 2, Formel 1 * * page 4, line 13 - line 18 * * Seite 6, Formeln * * Seiten 7-10, Liste der Einzelverbindungen * * page 10, line 16 - page 11, line 4 *
 [DX]  - BORRIONE E. ET AL., "Synthesis and cycloaddition reactions of ethyl glyoxylate imines. Synthesis of substituted furo[3,2-c]quinolines and 7H-indeno[2,1-c]quinolines", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, PROVO, UT, US, (1988), vol. 25, no. 1831, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 1831 - 1835, XP000670083 [DX] 1-6,9-11,14,25 * Seite 1832, Formeln 6, 7 * * Seite 1834, Formel 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570250644
 [DX]  - BORRIONE, E. ET AL., "Diastereofacial selectivity in the cycloaddition of chiral glyoxylateimines to cyclopentadiene and indene. Synthesis of optically active tetrahydroquinolines", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1., CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH., GB, (1989), vol. 12, no. 9, ISSN 1472-7781, pages 2245 - 2250, XP000926476 [DX] 1-6,9-11,14,25 * Seite 2245, Abschnitte "Preparation and Characterization of the Reagents" und "Addition to Cyclopentadiene and Indene" * * Seite 2245, Formeln 1a-1c * * Seite 2246, Formeln 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19890002245
 [DX]  - R. W. CARLING ET AL., "2-Carboxytetrahydroquinolines. Conformational and stereochemical requirements for antagonism of the glycine site on the N-methyl-D-aspartate (NMDA) receptor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, (1992), vol. 35, no. 11, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1942 - 1953, XP001002472 [DX] 1-6,9-11,14,25 * Seite 1942, Zusammenfassung * * Seite 1942, Einführung * * Seite 1948, Formeln 8, 9, 11-18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00089a003