Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255812

EP1255812 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NON-HUMAN EMBRYOS OF HIGH-GENETIC VALUE AND OF PREDETERMINED SEX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.10.2010
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.12.2010  [2010/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Istituto Sperimentale Italiano " Lazzaro Spallanzani"
via Capolago, 16
20133 Milan / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Istituto Sperimentale Italiano " Lazzaro Spallanzani"
via Capolago, 16
20133 Milan / IT
Inventor(s)01 / GALLI, Andrea
Via Pertini, 24
I-24035 Curno / IT
02 / ALEANDRI, Riccardo
Via Dessié, 4
I-00199 Rome / IT
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2002/46]Gervasi, Gemma, Dr.
Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date01902306.811.01.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001EP00281
Priority number, dateIT2000MI0003014.01.2000         Original published format: IT MI200030
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0151612
Date:19.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255812
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/06, A61D19/00, A01K67/02, G01N33/483, A61K35/52
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON HOCH QUALITATIVEN, NICHT-MENSCHLICHEN EMRYONEN VON PREDETERMINIERTEM GESCHLECHT[2002/46]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF NON-HUMAN EMBRYOS OF HIGH-GENETIC VALUE AND OF PREDETERMINED SEX[2002/46]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EMBRYONS NON HUMAINS PRESENTANT UNE VALEUR GENETIQUE ELEVEE ET UN SEXE PREDETERMINE[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase09.08.2002National basic fee paid 
09.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
11.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/48]
16.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
02.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5135759  (JOHNSON LAWRENCE A [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9933956  (XY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 14 *;
 [X]  - STAP JAN ET AL, "Improving the resolution of cryopreserved X- and Y-sperm during DNA flow cytometric analysis with the addition of Percoll to quench the fluorescence of dead sperm.", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, (199807), vol. 76, no. 7, ISSN 0021-8812, pages 1896 - 1902, XP000985715 [X] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SEIDEL G E JR ET AL, "Insemination of heifers with sexed sperm.", THERIOGENOLOGY, (199912), vol. 52, no. 8, ISSN 0093-691X, pages 1407 - 1420, XP000995617 [X] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0093-691X(99)00226-5
 [Y]  - RENS WIM ET AL, "Improved flow cytometric sorting of X- and Y-chromosome bearing sperm: Substantial increase in yield of sexed semen.", MOLECULAR REPRODUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT, (199901), vol. 52, no. 1, ISSN 1040-452X, pages 50 - 56, XP000996007 [Y] 1-17 * page 51, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-2795(199901)52:1<50::AID-MRD7>3.0.CO;2-H
 [Y]  - JOHNSON L A, "SEX PRESELECTION BY FLOW CYTOMETRIC SEPARATION OF X AND Y CHROMOSOME-BEARING SPERM BASED ON DNA DIFFERENCE: A REVIEW", REPRODUCTION, FERTILITY AND DEVELOPMENT,AU,CSIRO, EAST MELBOURNE, (1995), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1031-3613, pages 893 - 903, XP002915903 [Y] 1-17 * page 900, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/RD9950893
 [Y]  - LU K H ET AL, "In vitro fertilization with flow-cytometrically-sorted bovine sperm.", THERIOGENOLOGY, (199912), vol. 52, no. 8, ISSN 0093-691X, pages 1393 - 1405, XP000995618 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0093-691X(99)00225-3