EP1254954 - METHOD OF DETECTING LIGAND OR LIGAND-LIKE LOW-MOLECULAR WEIGHT COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc. 408, Tashirodaikan-machi Tosu-shi, Saga 841-0017 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 408, Tashirodaikan-machi Tosu-shi, Saga 841-0017 / JP | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Hisamitsu Medical Co., Ltd. 1-11-1 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6221 / JP | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Biomedix Co., Ltd 12-4, Nihonbashihamacho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8481 / JP | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states SSP Co., Ltd. 12-4, Nihonbashi-hamacho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIYAMA, Tadayoshi 2-71-1-105, Chiyozaki-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0864 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Tadahiro 3-1-43-207, Yatsu Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0026 / JP | 03 /
KUSANO, Koji 309-137, Owada Yachiyo-shi, Chiba 276-0045 / JP | 04 /
EBARA, Shinji 1143-60, Nanpeidai Narita-shi, Chiba 286-0042 / JP | 05 /
TACHIBANA, Koichi 143-97, Iida-cho Narita-shi, Chiba 286-0041 / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/45] | Hartz, Nikolai, Dr., et al Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01902796.0 | 07.02.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001JP00858 | Priority number, date | JP20000030039 | 08.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000030039 | JP20000307653 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000307653 | [2002/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0159096 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254954 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/566 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/566 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/32 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/5017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | C12N15/09, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/02, G01N33/566, G01N33/50, G01N33/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON LIGANDEN ODER LIGANDEN ÄHNLICHEN NIEDERMOLEKULAREN VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/45] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING LIGAND OR LIGAND-LIKE LOW-MOLECULAR WEIGHT COMPOUND | [2002/45] | French: | METHODE DE DETECTION D'UN LIGAND OU D'UN COMPOSE A FAIBLE POIDS MOLECULAIRE DU TYPE LIGAND | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2002 | Translation filed | 02.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 25.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2006 | 12.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HUELTNER L ET AL, "THIOL-SENSITIVE MAST CELL LINES DERIVED FROM MOUSE BONE MARROW RESPOND TO A MAST CELL GROWTH-ENHANCING ACTIVITY DIFFERENT FROM BOTH IL-3 AND IL-4", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 142, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3440 - 3446, XP002273514 [A] 1-35 * the whole document, see especially the introduction * | International search | [X]US5932546 (BARRETT RONALD W [US], et al); | [X]WO9502823 (BRANN MARK ROBERT [US]) | [X] - STEVEN E. CWIRLA ET AL., "Peptide agonist of the thrombopoietin receptor as potent as the natural cytokine", SCIENCE, (199706), vol. 276, pages 1696 - 1699, XP002941683 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.276.5319.1696 | [Y] - ALICE S.-Y. HO ET AL., "Functional regions of the mouse interleukin-10 receptor cytoplasmic domain", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199509), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 5043 - 5053, XP002941684 | [Y] - RIKIRO FUKUNAGA ET AL., "Functional domains of the granulocyte colony-stimulating factor receptor", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1991), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 2855 - 2865, XP002941685 | [Y] - ALAN D. D'ANDREA ET AL., "The cytoplasmic region of the erythropoietin receptor contains nonoverlapping positive and negative growth-regulatory domains", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199104), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 1980 - 1987, XP002941686 |