Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1266989

EP1266989 - METHOD OF KNITTING STRIPE PATTERN OF TUBULAR KNITTING FABRIC AND THE KNITTING FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shima Seiki Mfg., Ltd.
85 Sakata
Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 641-8511 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/16]For all designated states
Shima Seiki Mfg., Ltd
85 Sakata Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 641-8511 / JP
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
Shima Seiki Mfg., Ltd
85 Sakata
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641-8511 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKAMOTO, Kazuyoshi
1432 Ohashidori 1-chome
Gose-shi, Nara 639-2238 / JP
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Jackson, Robert Patrick
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Jackson, Robert Patrick
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date01902850.513.02.2001
[2002/51]
WO2001JP00996
Priority number, dateJP2000003969817.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000039698
[2002/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0161092
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1266989
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1266989
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:D04B1/00, D04B1/10
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM STRICKEN EINES STREIFENMUSTERS IN RUNDSTRICKSTOFF UND DER STRICKSTOFF[2002/51]
English:METHOD OF KNITTING STRIPE PATTERN OF TUBULAR KNITTING FABRIC AND THE KNITTING FABRIC[2002/51]
French:PROCEDE DE TRICOTAGE D'UN MOTIF A BANDES SUR UN TRICOT TUBULAIRE ET TRICOT[2002/51]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2002Translation filed 
26.07.2002National basic fee paid 
26.07.2002Search fee paid 
26.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
26.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
27.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2010Fee for grant paid
03.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13]
Request for further processing for:23.01.2007Request for further processing filed
23.01.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.02.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES01.08.2010
[2010/46]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0854219  (STOLL & CO H [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * column 1, line 48 - column 5, line 28; figures 1,4-7; claim 4 *;
 [PX]EP1219740  (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]) [PX] 1,5,6,8 * column 6, lines 12-51; figures 3,5; claim 4 *;
 [DA]EP0699791  (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]);
 [A]US2375474  (HAROLD HOLMES HENRY, et al) [A] 8 * figure 2 *
International search[A]JPH1060758  (SHIMA SEIKI MFG);
 [A]JPH08188942  (SHIMA SEIKI MFG)