Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1252179

EP1252179 - HIGH PURITY LIPOPEPTIDES, LIPOPEPTIDE MICELLES, PROCESSES FOR PREPARING SAME AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
65 Hayden Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
[2003/06]
Former [2002/44]For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
24 Emily Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KELLEHER, Thomas, J.
36 Laxfield Street
Weston, MA 02493 / US
02 / LAI, Jan-Ji
5 Roy Street
Westborough, MA 01581 / US
03 / DECOURCEY, Joseph, P.
3 Auburn Street
Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
04 / LYNCH, Paul, D.
29 Cypress Road
Arlington, MA 02474 / US
05 / ZENONI, Maurizio
Via Fleming 7
I-20067 Paullo / IT
06 / TAGLIANI, Auro, R.
Via Marangoni 1
I-27100 Pavia / IT
 [2002/44]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/44]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date01903121.018.01.2001
[2002/44]
WO2001US01748
Priority number, dateUS20000177170P20.01.2000         Original published format: US 177170 P
US2000073519128.11.2000         Original published format: US 735191
[2002/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0153330
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1252179
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2002/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1252179
Date:30.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP18.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/08, C07K5/097, A61K38/10, A61P31/04
[2002/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHREINE LIPOPEPTIDE, LIPOPEPTID MIZELLEN, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND ARZNEIMITTEL[2005/39]
English:HIGH PURITY LIPOPEPTIDES, LIPOPEPTIDE MICELLES, PROCESSES FOR PREPARING SAME AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM[2002/44]
French:LIPOPEPTIDES A HAUTE PURETE, MICELLES DE LIPOPEPTIDES ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION[2002/44]
Former [2002/44]HOCHREINE LIPOPEPTIDE, LIPOPEPTID MIZELLEN, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Entry into regional phase20.08.2002National basic fee paid 
20.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/44]
09.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2005Fee for grant paid
17.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05015374.1  / EP1586580
EP09014616.8  / EP2159229
EP10174862.2  / EP2264047
EP15173312.8  / EP2940034
EP15173324.3  / EP2940036
Opposition(s)31.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200505   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE30.11.2005
CY30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
TR30.11.2005
MC31.01.2006
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/37]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
TR30.11.2005
MC31.01.2006
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2007/45]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
MC31.01.2006
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2007/36]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
IT30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
MC31.01.2006
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/50]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
MC31.01.2006
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
ES13.03.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/48]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
MC31.01.2006
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/44]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
MC31.01.2006
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/38]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/36]BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/35]FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/23]FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[DXA]US5912226  (BAKER PATRICK J [US], et al) [DX] 1-10,31,33-39 * examples 3-5 * [A] 11-30,40-56,78,81,82;
 [DXY]EP0095295  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [DX] 32,57-72,86-94 * the whole document * [Y] 73-81,83-85;
 [XA]EP0178152  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 32 * the whole document * [A] 15-17,79-81;
 [XY]EP0337731  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 57,59-70,72,86-94 * the whole document * [Y] 73,75-78,83-85;
 [DA]EP0294990  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [DA] 1-31,33-56 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - DEBONO M ET AL, "Enzymatic and chemical modifications of lipopeptide antibiotic A21978C: the synthesis and evaluation of daptomycin (LY146032)", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION. TOKYO, JP, (1988), vol. 41, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 1093 - 1105, XP002171833 [X] 32 * figure 2; table 4 *
 [Y]  - LIN S-C ET AL, "General approach for the development of high-performance liquid chromatography methods for biosurfactant analysis and purification", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, (19981106), vol. 825, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 149 - 159, XP004144788 [Y] 73-81,83-85 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(98)00709-2
 [Y]  - LIN E.A., "Recovery and purification of the lipopeptide biosurfactant of Bacillus subtilis by ultrafiltration", BIOTECHNOLOGY TECHNIQUES, (199706), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 413 - 416, XP001035187 [Y] 73-81,83-85 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018468723132
 [DA]  - TALLY F P ET AL, "DAPTOMYCIN: A NOVEL AGENT FOR GRAM-POSITIVE INFECTIONS", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS,GB,ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, (199908), vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 1223 - 1228, XP000891801 [DA] 9,10,33-39,57-72,86-94 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.8.8.1223
 [A]  - THIMON E.A., "Surface-active properties of antifungal lipopeptides produced by Bacillus subtilis", JAOCS, vol. 69, no. 1, pages 92 - 93, XP002181598 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02635884