Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1268891

EP1268891 - FIBERS AND FABRICS PREPARED WITH PROPYLENE IMPACT COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77520 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COLUCCI, Dina, M.
2413 Baycrest Drive
Houston, TX 77058 / US
02 / CHENG, Chia, Y.
902 Live Oak Lane
Seabrook, TX 77586-4405 / US
03 / FERRY, William, M.
4315 Moonlight Shadow Court
Houston, TX 77059 / US
04 / PLANK, Don, A.
2424 Spellbrook Court
League City, Texas 77573 / US
 [2003/26]
Former [2003/01]01 / COLUCCI, Dina, M.
2413 Baycrest Drive
Houston, TX 77058 / US
02 / CHENG, Chia, Y.
902 Live Oak Lane
Seabrook, TX 77586-4405 / US
03 / FERRY, William, M.
4315 Moonlight Shadow Court
Houston, TX 77059 / US
04 / PLANK, Don, A.
1 Thunderbird
Baytown, TX 77521 / US
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/15]Gerstberger, Gisela
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. P.O. Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [2012/10]Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2003/01]Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr.
Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01903387.726.01.2001
[2003/01]
WO2001US02763
Priority number, dateUS2000051536129.02.2000         Original published format: US 515361
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0164980
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1268891
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1268891
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/30, C08L23/12
[2011/41]
Former International [2003/01]D01F6/30, D04H1/42, D04H1/56, D04H3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/01]
TitleGerman:FASERN UND FLÄCHENGEBILDE HERGESTELLT AUS SCHLAGFESTEN PROPYLENCOPOLYMEREN[2003/01]
English:FIBERS AND FABRICS PREPARED WITH PROPYLENE IMPACT COPOLYMERS[2003/01]
French:FIBRES ET TOILES PREPAREES AVEC DES COPOLYMERES D'IMPACT PROPYLENE[2003/01]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2002National basic fee paid 
07.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
22.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2012Fee for grant paid
26.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.12.2012  13.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pontaccio 10
20121 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Colucci, Giuseppe, et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Piazzale G. Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
 [2019/01]
Former [2013/03]
Opponent(s)01  07.12.2012  13.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Soperga 14/A
20127 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Colucci, Giuseppe, et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P. le Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
15.01.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.09.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.09.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition02.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2591/16
07.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
PT09.07.2012
GB26.01.2013
IE26.01.2013
LU26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/07]AT07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
PT09.07.2012
GB26.01.2013
IE26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/51]AT07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
PT09.07.2012
GB26.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/48]AT07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
PT09.07.2012
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT07.03.2012
CY07.03.2012
DK07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
ES18.06.2012
PT09.07.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/01]CY07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
PT09.07.2012
Former [2012/48]CY07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
SE07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY07.03.2012
FI07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI07.03.2012
GR08.06.2012
Former [2012/36]GR08.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9919547  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9839384  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [D]US5994482  (GEORGELLIS GEORGE BYRON [US], et al);
 [A]EP0598224  (HIMONT INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5948839  (CHATTERJEE ANANDA M [US]) [DA] 1-16 * column W *
by applicantWO9919547
 US5258464
 US5362782
 US5948839
 US5382630