Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257731

EP1257731 - EQUIPMENT WITH MUTUALLY INTERACTING SPIRAL TEETH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2005Change - applicantpublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
02.09.2005Change - representativepublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Perna, Vratislav
Drevarska 20
602 00 Brno / CZ
[2005/42]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Perna, Vratislav
Tukova 40
602 00 Brno / CZ
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Multus, Radek
Zakany 253
664 11 Zbov / CZ
For all designated states
Perna, Vratislav
Tukova 40
602 00 Brno / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/01]
Former [2002/47]01 / PERNA, Vratislav;
Tuckova 40
602 00 Brno / CZ
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2005/42]
Former [2002/47]Zak, Vitezslav
Lidicka 51
60200 Brno / CZ
Application number, filing date01903590.615.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001CZ00007
Priority number, dateCZ2000000058118.02.2000         Original published format: CZ 20000581
[2002/47]
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0161151
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257731
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F01C1/16, F01C3/08
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANLAGE MIT GEGENSEITIG INEINANDERGREIFENDEN SCHRAUBENZÄHNEN[2002/47]
English:EQUIPMENT WITH MUTUALLY INTERACTING SPIRAL TEETH[2002/47]
French:EQUIPEMENT A DENTURES HELICOIDALES A INTERACTION MUTUELLE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase23.08.2001Translation filed 
16.09.2002National basic fee paid 
16.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
01.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
05.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE19728434  (BUSCH SA ATEL [CH]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 26 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 9; figure . * [Y] 1,2;
 [X]US2908226  (RICH JOHN P, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 26 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-3 * * column 7, line 11 - line 47; figures 19-22 *;
 [Y]WO8706654  (SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER AB [SE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 35; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]GB419338  (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 44 - line 82; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]GB2030227  (KLAEY E, et al) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 71 - page 2, line 37; figure 1 *
by applicantCZ8308U
 WO9314299
 DE19738132
 US5533887