EP1254133 - INDOL-3-YL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS INTEGRIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/45] | INDOL-3-YL DERIVATIVES | ||
[2004/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODMAN, Simon Friedrich-Ebert Strasse 102a 64347 Griesheim / DE | 02 /
GOTTSCHLICH, Rudolf Buchenweg 1 64354 Reinheim / DE | 03 /
WIESNER, Matthias Buchenweg 73 55128 Mainz / DE | [2002/45] | Application number, filing date | 01903624.3 | 05.01.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001EP00084 | Priority number, date | DE2000106139 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006139 | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0158893 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254133 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254133 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/16] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1254133 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/404, A61P43/00, C07D403/12, C07D417/14, C07D209/18 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 12.06.2002 | LV | 12.06.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 12.06.2002 | SI | 12.06.2002 | Title | German: | INDOL-3-YL-DERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS INTEGRIN-INHIBITOREN | [2002/45] | English: | INDOL-3-YL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS INTEGRIN INHIBITORS | [2004/46] | French: | DERIVES DE 3-INDOLE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS D'INTEGRINE | [2004/46] |
Former [2002/45] | INDOL-3-YL DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2002/45] | DERIVES D'INDOL-3-YL | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 28.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.04.2005 | TR | 20.04.2005 | DK | 20.07.2005 | GR | 20.07.2005 | AT | 05.01.2006 | FI | 05.01.2006 | IE | 05.01.2006 | SE | 06.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | TR | 20.04.2005 | |
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
AT | 05.01.2006 | ||
FI | 05.01.2006 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 06.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | DK | 20.07.2005 | |
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
AT | 05.01.2006 | ||
FI | 05.01.2006 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 06.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | DK | 20.07.2005 | |
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2006 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 06.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | DK | 20.07.2005 | |
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 06.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | DK | 20.07.2005 | |
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | DK | 20.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9412478 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1,7-11 * page 1 - page 2; example 9 *; | [A]WO9737655 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,7-11 * claims 1,11,12 *; | [A]WO9933798 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,7-11* page 34 - page 35 * |