Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256267

EP1256267 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kahl, Helmut
Horstwalder Strasse 23
12307 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Tiburtius, Bernd
Rosenhag 10
14532 Kleinmachnow / DE
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Keussen, Christof
Glawe Delfs Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]Keussen, Christof, Dr.
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2002/46]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date01903666.422.01.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001EP00671
Priority number, dateDE200010335522.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10003355
[2002/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154466
Date:26.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256267
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256267
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05K9/00
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN ABSCHIRMUNG[2002/46]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC SHIELD[2002/46]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN BLINDAGE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2002National basic fee paid 
22.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
28.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2004Fee for grant paid
08.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
TR16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
PT16.11.2004
CY22.01.2005
LU22.01.2005
AT31.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/40]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
TR16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
CY22.01.2005
LU22.01.2005
AT31.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/36]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
TR16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
CY22.01.2005
LU22.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/20]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
TR16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
CY22.01.2005
LU22.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/10]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
TR16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
LU22.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/51]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
TR16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/47]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/14]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/13]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
BE31.01.2005
Former [2005/23]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/19]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE16.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9808365  (KAHL HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1 * * pages 9-12; figures 1-4 * [Y] 18;
 [Y]JPS63136639  ;
 [X]JPH06283884  ;
 [X]US4838475  (MULLINS AARON B [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,10 * column 2, lines 49-68; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0721294  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE4319965  (EMI TEC ELEKTRONISCHE MATERIAL [DE])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881020), vol. 012, no. 395, Database accession no. (E - 671), [Y] 18 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, [X] 1,7,8,12,13,15 * abstract *