Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254353

EP1254353 - FLUORESCENCE INTENSITY MULTIPLE DISTRIBUTIONS ANALYSIS: CONCURRENT DETERMINATION OF DIFFUSION TIMES AND MOLECULAR BRIGHTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evotec OAI AG
Schnackenburgallee 114
22525 Hamburg / DE
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / KASK, Peet
Uus 5-3
3051 Harku / EE
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date01903729.009.02.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001EP01431
Priority number, dateUS20000181564P10.02.2000         Original published format: US 181564 P
EP2000012677406.12.2000         Original published format: EP 00126774
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0159416
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254353
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254353
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/44
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUORESZENZINTENSITÄTSANALYSE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON VERTEILUNGEN: KONKURRIERENDE BESTIMMUNG VON DIFFUSIONSZEITEN UND MOLEKULARER HELLIGKEIT[2002/45]
English:FLUORESCENCE INTENSITY MULTIPLE DISTRIBUTIONS ANALYSIS: CONCURRENT DETERMINATION OF DIFFUSION TIMES AND MOLECULAR BRIGHTNESS[2002/45]
French:ANALYSE DE REPARTITIONS MULTIPLES D'INTENSITES DE FLUORESCENCE, DETERMINATION CONCURRENTE DE DUREES DE DIFFUSION ET DE BRILLANCE MOLECULAIRE[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2002National basic fee paid 
25.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
08.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2004Fee for grant paid
03.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.04.2004
BE14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
FR14.04.2004
IT14.04.2004
NL14.04.2004
TR14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
PT14.09.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/36]AT14.04.2004
BE14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
FR14.04.2004
IT14.04.2004
NL14.04.2004
TR14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2006/51]AT14.04.2004
BE14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
FR14.04.2004
NL14.04.2004
TR14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2006/14]AT14.04.2004
BE14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
FR14.04.2004
NL14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2006/13]AT14.04.2004
BE14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
NL14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT14.04.2004
BE14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2005/14]AT14.04.2004
BE14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2005/11]AT14.04.2004
FI14.04.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2005/06]FI14.04.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI14.04.2004
SE14.07.2004
ES25.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE14.07.2004
Cited inInternational search[XAY]EP0884583  (EVOTEC BIOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,12-16 * page 3, line 14 - line 19 * * page 3, line 33 - line 58 * * page 4, line 8 - line 16 * * page 5, line 38 - line 49 * [A] 9 [Y] 7;
 [PY]EP1063502  (EVOTEC BIOSYSTEMS AG [DE]) [PY] 7 * abstract *;
 [X]US4198571  (SHEPPARD COLIN J R [GB]) [X] 17 * column 2, line 2 - line 20 * * column 3, line 23 - line 33 *