Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260123

EP1260123 - SWITCH HOUSING WITH A COOLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rittal GmbH & Co. KG
Auf dem Stützelberg
35745 Herborn / DE
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / EDELMANN, Achim
Hermann-Löns-Strasse 15
57234 Wilnsdorf / DE
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing.
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date01903730.809.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001EP01437
Priority number, dateDE200010746718.02.2000         Original published format: DE 10007467
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0162058
Date:23.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260123
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260123
Date:06.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, H02B1/56
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:SCHALTGEHÄUSE MIT EINEM KÜHLGERÄT[2002/48]
English:SWITCH HOUSING WITH A COOLING DEVICE[2002/48]
French:BOITIER D'ARMOIRE DE DISTRIBUTION DOTE D'UN APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2002National basic fee paid 
18.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
24.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2004Fee for grant paid
03.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
IT06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
AT09.02.2005
CY09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
LU09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
FR28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
PT06.03.2005
[2008/45]
Former [2008/03]ES06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
IT06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
AT09.02.2005
CY09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
LU09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
PT06.03.2005
Former [2007/36]ES06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
IT06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
AT09.02.2005
CY09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
LU09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2007/20]ES06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
AT09.02.2005
CY09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
LU09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2007/10]ES06.10.2004
IE06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
AT09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
LU09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/51]IE06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
TR06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
AT09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/34]IE06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
AT09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/14]IE06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/13]IE06.10.2004
NL06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
FI09.02.2005
GB09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
Former [2005/52]IE06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
FI09.02.2005
SE10.02.2005
Former [2005/50]IE06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
SE10.02.2005
Former [2005/46]IE06.10.2004
DK06.01.2005
GR06.01.2005
Former [2005/26]GR06.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US5504924  (OHASHI SHINGEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 15 * * column 5, lines 47-49 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 16 * * column 7, lines 20-25 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 2 * * column 8, lines 47-59 * * column 9, lines 65-67; figures 1,4,5,11 *;
 [A]US5203399  (KOIZUMI HISAO [JP]) [A] 1,2,5-7 * column 5, lines 20-29 * * column 9, lines 30-35; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]WO9106995  (SACE SPA [IT]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, lines 10-12,27-38 * * page 4, lines 9-20; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]EP0400335  (ALSTHOM GEC [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 28-37 * * page 4, lines 37-54; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4921039  (GHIRALDI ALBERTO [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *