Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256062

EP1256062 - TRANSPORTING PORTABLE ELECTRONIC OBJECT PROTOCOL UNITS BY PROTOCOL FOR MICRO-COMPUTER FOR PERIPHERALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2008
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.11.2008  [2008/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEMPLUS
Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos
13420 Gémenos / FR
[2007/51]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
GEMPLUS
Avenue du pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos
13420 Gemenos Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / COULIER, Charles
19 Avenue Frédéric Mistral, Le Cannet
13360 Roquevaire / FR
 [2002/46]
Application number, filing date01904043.502.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001FR00326
Priority number, dateFR2000000139903.02.2000         Original published format: FR 0001399
[2002/46]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0157684
Date:09.08.2001
Language:FR
[2001/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256062
Date:13.11.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256062
Date:19.12.2007
Language:FR
[2007/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/38, G06K19/07
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROTOKOLLEINHEITENÜBERTRAGUNG VON TRAGBAREM ELEKTRONISCHEM GEGENSTAND MIT PROTOKOLL FÜR MIKRORECHNERPERIPHERIEGERÄTE[2002/46]
English:TRANSPORTING PORTABLE ELECTRONIC OBJECT PROTOCOL UNITS BY PROTOCOL FOR MICRO-COMPUTER FOR PERIPHERALS[2002/46]
French:TRANSPORT D'UNITES DE PROTOCOLE D'OBJET ELECTRONIQUE PORTABLE PAR PROTOCOLE POUR PERIPHERIQUES DE MICRO-ORDINATEUR[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2002National basic fee paid 
03.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
17.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2007Fee for grant paid
02.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[PXY]FR2783336  (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]) [PX] 1,2 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 3 * * page 4, line 10 - page 8, line 17 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-8;
 [Y]EP0577006  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [Y] 3-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5420412  (KOWALSKI JACEK [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO0016255
    JOURNAL ARTICLE, "USB UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS SPECIFICATION VERSION 1.0", UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS (USB), (19960115), pages 1 - 268, XP002917782