Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254119

EP1254119 - PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF COX-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CARTER, Malcolm Clive
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / NAYLOR, Alan
c/o GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park
Harlow Essex, CM19 5AW / GB
03 / PAYNE, Jeremy John
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
04 / PEGG, Neil Anthony
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
 [2006/06]
Former [2002/45]01 / CARTER, Malcolm Clive
Glaxo Wellcome plc, Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / NAYLOR, Alan
Glaxo Wellcome plc, Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
03 / PAYNE, Jeremy John
Glaxo Wellcome plc, Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
04 / PEGG, Neil Anthony
Glaxo Smith Kline Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
Representative(s)Giddings, Peter John , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Giddings, Peter John , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex
TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2002/45]Giddings, Peter John , et al
GlaxoSmithkline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date01904117.708.02.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001GB00511
Priority number, dateGB2000000322411.02.2000         Original published format: GB 0003224
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0158881
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254119
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254119
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/42, C07D401/12, C07D407/12, C07D409/12, C07D417/12, A61K31/505, A61K31/506, A61P29/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PYRIMIDIN-DERIVATE ALS SELECTIVE INHIBITOREN VON COX-2[2002/45]
English:PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF COX-2[2002/45]
French:DERIVES DE PYRIMIDINE UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA COX-2[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2002National basic fee paid 
19.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
06.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2005Fee for grant paid
15.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
CY12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
TR12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
CY12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2008/19]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2008/04]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/36]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/19]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/10]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/03]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
Former [2006/52]AT12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
Former [2006/51]FI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SE12.07.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9824782  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,29 *;
 [A]WO9803484  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 12,15,18,19 *