Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1179568

EP1179568 - POLYAMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8205 / JP
[2006/19]
Former [2002/07]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ARAMAKI, Masaaki
12-7-201, Midorigaoka 4-chome
Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0863 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Katsushi
334-11, Sakurakouji
Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0816 / JP
03 / NAKASHIMA, Ikutoshi
2633-9, Wakabacho 2-chome
Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0875 / JP
 [2002/07]
Representative(s)Blake, John Henry Francis
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/07]Blake, John Henry Francis
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date01904462.715.02.2001
[2002/07]
WO2001JP01067
Priority number, dateJP2000003753316.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000037533
JP2000003753416.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000037534
JP2000004153318.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000041533
[2002/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160918
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1179568
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1179568
Date:10.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08L77/00, C08L71/12, C08G69/04, C08K5/098, C08K3/32, C08K3/10
[2002/37]
Former International [2002/07]C08L77/00, C08L71/12, C08G69/04, C08K5/098, C08K3/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2002/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYAMIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2002/07]
English:POLYAMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION[2002/07]
French:COMPOSITION DE RESINE POLYAMIDE[2002/07]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2001Translation filed 
16.10.2001National basic fee paid 
16.10.2001Search fee paid 
16.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/07]
06.11.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2006Fee for grant paid
13.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[PA]EP1036819  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [PA] 1-10 * page 9, line 47 * * example 33 * * claims 1,2,4,10 *;
 [PA]JP2000225675  ;
 [A]JPH03217454
 [PA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 03, Database accession no. 2001-018869, XP002206820 & JP2000225675 A 20000815 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK) [PA] 1-10 * abstract * *[0037],[0041],[072],[0143],[0150],[0151]*
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 45, Database accession no. 1991-327990, XP002206821 & JPH03217454 A 19910925 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH11199771  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [Y]US4857575  (VAN DER MEER ROELOF F [NL], et al);
 [Y]JPH10278065  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [Y]JPH02120359  (UBE INDUSTRIES);
 [Y]JPS4880149  ;
 [Y]JPH04202357  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [Y]JPH0632979  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [Y]JPH07228768  (KURARAY CO)