Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255478

EP1255478 - A DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE LEVEL OF A LIQUID IN A BOILER OF A COFFEE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.09.2009  [2009/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RANCILIO MACCHINE PER CAFFE' S.p.A.
Viale della Repubblica 40
I-20010 Villastanza di Parabiago (Milano) / IT
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / FOGAGNOLO, Armando
Viale della Repubblica, 40
I-20010 Villastanza di Parabiago / IT
02 / RADAELLI, Roberto
Viale della Repubblica, 40
I-20010 Villastanza di Parabiago / IT
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Robba, Pierpaolo , et al
Interpatent S.R.L.
Via Caboto, 35
10129 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Robba, Pierpaolo , et al
Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35
10129 Torino / IT
Former [2002/46]Robba, Pierpaolo , et al
INTERPATENT S.R.L., Via Caboto No.35
10129 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date01905760.312.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001EP01465
Priority number, dateIT2000TO0015016.02.2000         Original published format: IT TO20000150
[2003/31]
Former [2002/46]IT2000PN0001516.02.2000
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160221
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255478
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255478
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/56
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN DES FLÜSSIGKEITSNIVEAUS IN EINEM WASSERERHITZER EINER KAFFEEMASCHINE[2002/46]
English:A DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE LEVEL OF A LIQUID IN A BOILER OF A COFFEE MACHINE[2002/46]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR CONTROLER LE NIVEAU DE LIQUIDE DANS LA BOUILLOIRE D'UNE MACHINE A CAFE[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2002National basic fee paid 
22.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
13.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2003Fee for grant paid
14.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
CY30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
TR30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE12.02.2004
LU12.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
[2007/10]
Former [2006/51]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
TR30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE12.02.2004
LU12.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/23]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE12.02.2004
LU12.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/19]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
IE12.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/02]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
MC28.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
Former [2004/29]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT30.07.2003
BE30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/16]AT30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
Former [2004/13]FI30.07.2003
NL30.07.2003
Former [2004/12]FI30.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]GB696907  (DAG SIGURDSSON SCHREIBER) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 83; figure - *;
 [XA]US5388501  (HAZAN JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 42; figure 2 * [A] 7;
 [X]EP0377508  (STANDEX INT CORP [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 39; figures 1A,1B,4A,4B *;
 [X]NL8400492  (DAALDEROP BV) [X] 1,8,9 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 7; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4261397  (GUY EDWARD L)