EP1254334 - AUTO-DRAIN UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARKER HANNIFIN PLC Parker House 55 Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP2 4SJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Parker Hannifin plc Parker House 55 Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire HP2 4SJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states PARKER HANNIFIN PLC Parker House, 55 Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire HP2 4SJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELLICK, David Weathertop House, Quince Drive Bisley, Surrey GU24 9RT / GB | 02 /
TROUP, Alan 8 Lapwing Close Horsham, West Sussex RH13 5PB / GB | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01905868.4 | 09.02.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001GB00521 | Priority number, date | GB20000002790 | 09.02.2000 Original published format: GB 0002790 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0159355 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254334 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254334 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16T1/14 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
F16T1/14 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3052 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES ABLAUFVENTIL | [2002/45] | English: | AUTO-DRAIN UNIT | [2002/45] | French: | UNITE A PURGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2004 | BE | 28.04.2004 | CH | 28.04.2004 | FI | 28.04.2004 | LI | 28.04.2004 | NL | 28.04.2004 | TR | 28.04.2004 | DK | 28.07.2004 | GR | 28.07.2004 | SE | 28.07.2004 | ES | 08.08.2004 | PT | 28.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
TR | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE236606 (ROODBERGEN) [A] 1* page 1, line 41 - line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1506346 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 31 - column R, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5595210 | US5636655 |