Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257678

EP1257678 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF METAL FOAMS BY ELECTROLYTIC REDUCTION OF POROUS OXIDIC PREFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metalysis Limited
Unit 2, Farfield Park Manvers Way Wath Upon Dearne
Rotherham S63 5DB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/40]For all designated states
Metalysis Limited
Unit 2, Farfield Park Manvers Way Wath Upon Dearne
Rotherham, S63 5DB / GB
Former [2006/39]For all designated states
Metalysis Limited
112 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1PH / GB
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Qinetiq Limited
85 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1 6TD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WARD-CLOSE, Malcolm
DERA, A7 Building, Room 2008
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB
02 / GODFREY, Alastair Bryan
DERA, A7 Building, Room 2008
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Goodman, Simon John Nye
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/12]Goodman, Simon John Nye
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Former [2002/47]Lowther, Deborah
D/IP QinetiQ Formalities, A4 Bldg, Ively Road
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB
Application number, filing date01905907.019.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001GB00661
Priority number, dateGB2000000397122.02.2000         Original published format: GB 0003971
GB2000001087308.05.2000         Original published format: GB 0010873
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0162995
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257678
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257678
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C22B34/12, C25F1/16, C25C3/28, C22B5/00, C22C33/02, A61L27/06
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLSCHAUM DURCH ELEKTROLYTISCHE REDUKTION PORÖSER OXIDISCHER VORFORMEN[2002/47]
English:METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF METAL FOAMS BY ELECTROLYTIC REDUCTION OF POROUS OXIDIC PREFORMS[2002/47]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION DE MOUSSES METALLIQUES PAR REDUCTION ELECTROLYTIQUE DE PREFORMES OXYDIQUES POREUSES[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2002National basic fee paid 
10.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
11.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2007Fee for grant paid
26.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
CY05.09.2007
DK05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
TR05.09.2007
SE05.12.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
IE19.02.2008
LU19.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
[2010/37]
Former [2010/32]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
CY05.09.2007
DK05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
SE05.12.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
IE19.02.2008
LU19.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2009/33]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
CY05.09.2007
DK05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
SE05.12.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
IE19.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2009/08]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
DK05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
SE05.12.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
IE19.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2008/46]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
DK05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
SE05.12.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2008/35]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
DK05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
SE05.12.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
Former [2008/28]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
SE05.12.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
Former [2008/24]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
NL05.09.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
PT06.02.2008
Former [2008/19]AT05.09.2007
BE05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
GR06.12.2007
ES16.12.2007
Former [2008/13]AT05.09.2007
CH05.09.2007
FI05.09.2007
LI05.09.2007
ES16.12.2007
Former [2008/10]FI05.09.2007
ES16.12.2007
Former [2008/08]ES16.12.2007
Cited inInternational search[XDAY]WO9964638  (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al) [XD] 1-8,11,15 * examples 8,12; claims 1,2,10,23,26 * [A] 9,10 [Y] 12-14;
 [A]JPH06271904  ;
 [A]US5865980  (RAY SIBA P [US], et al) [A] 9-11 * abstract *;
 [Y]DE29822563U  (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 12-14 * figure 1; claims 1-4,9 *;
 [Y]US5861070  (REICHMAN STEVEN H [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * example 1; tables 1,2 *;
 [Y]RU2111935
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 43, Database accession no. 1994-347403, XP002169806 & JPH06271904 A 19940927 (JAPAN METALS & CHEM CO LTD) [A] 9-11 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 51, Database accession no. 1998-608132, XP002169858 & RU2111935 C 19980527 (ILICH ABRASIVES WKS STOCK CO) [Y] 13 * abstract *