blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1258370

EP1258370 - NONCONTACT ID CARD AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/47]NONCONTACT ID CARD OR THE LIKE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME
[2008/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY ENGINEERING CO., LTD.
Mitsui No. 2 Bldg., 4-18, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0005 / JP
[2008/52]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
TORAY ENGINEERING CO., LTD.
Mitsui No. 2 Bldg., 4-18, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AKITA, Masanori
1-17-14-612, Nakasho
Otsu-shi, Shiga 525-0838 / JP
02 / ITO, Koji
38-18, Nango 2-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0865 / JP
03 / MORI, Toshihiro
50-17, Miyake-cho
Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0051 / JP
04 / NOGAMI, Yoshio
12-2, Matsunoki 1-chome
Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0902 / JP
05 / KURAMOTO, Yoshio
18-16, Ouyamada 4-chome
Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0903 / JP
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date01906168.821.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001JP01253
Priority number, dateJP2000004400622.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000044006
[2002/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0162517
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258370
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258370
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06K19/077
[2004/25]
CPC:
G06K19/07722 (EP,US); G06K19/077 (KR); G06K19/07718 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US); G06K19/07752 (EP,US); H01L2224/05001 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05022 (EP,US); H01L2224/05026 (EP,US); H01L2224/05571 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US); H01L2224/73204 (EP,US); H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2224/05124, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05155, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05639, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2002/47]B42D15/10, G06K19/07, G06K19/077
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/47]
TitleGerman:KONTAKTLOSE IC-KARTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2002/47]
English:NONCONTACT ID CARD AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2008/30]
French:CARTE D'IDENTIFICATION SANS CONTACT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT[2008/30]
Former [2002/47]NONCONTACT ID CARD OR THE LIKE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME
Former [2002/47]CARTE D'IDENTIFICATION SANS CONTACT OU ANALOGUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT
Entry into regional phase20.08.2002Translation filed 
19.08.2002National basic fee paid 
19.08.2002Search fee paid 
19.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
20.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
06.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2008Fee for grant paid
10.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07075543.4  / EP1843280
Opposition(s)25.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
03.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
09.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5969415  (PRANCZ MARKUS [AT]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 4 * * column 8, line 40 - column 9, line 67 * * column 11, line 8 - column 11, line 50; figures 2,7 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]US5904859  (DEGANI YINON [US]) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 30 - column 1, line 67 *;
 [X]EP0829819  (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 19 * * column 7, line 9 - column 7, line 34 *;
 [X]WO0002160  (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,11 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 10 *;
 [X]DE19709985  (PAV CARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,11 * column 10, line 48 - column 13, line 58 *;
 [X]FR2764414  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,11 * page 2, line 4 - page 7, line 26 *
International search[Y]JPH10203060  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH06120296  (HITACHI LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPH10329462  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH09321391  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO);
 [Y]JPH09186163  (MOTOROLA INC);
 [Y]JPH1134553  (ROHM CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH1050709  (TOSHIBA CORP)
ExaminationDE19745648
 DE19534480
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.