blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1191823

EP1191823 - ORGANIC EL DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Former [2002/13]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, Hidekazu
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-Chome
Suwa-Shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP
 [2002/13]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/13]Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date01906318.926.02.2001
[2002/13]
WO2001JP01428
Priority number, dateJP2000005016525.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000050165
[2002/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0163975
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1191823
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1191823
Date:16.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:H05B33/26, H05B33/10, H05B33/14
[2002/13]
CPC:
H05B33/14 (EP,US); H10F55/00 (KR); H05B33/26 (KR);
H10K50/814 (US); H10K59/80516 (EP,KR,US); H10K2102/3026 (EP,US);
H10K2102/321 (EP,US); H10K50/841 (US); H10K50/865 (US);
H10K59/12 (EP,KR,US); H10K59/17 (EP,KR,US); H10K59/871 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/8792 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/20]
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2002/13]
English:ORGANIC EL DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF[2002/13]
French:DISPOSITIF ORGANIQUE EL ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2002/13]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2001Translation filed 
15.11.2001National basic fee paid 
15.11.2001Search fee paid 
15.11.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
06.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2009Fee for grant paid
26.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
12.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL16.12.2009
[2010/36]
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH10335068  ;
 [Y]JPH118074  ;
 [X]EP0822603  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]);
 [A]US5742129  (NAGAYAMA KENICHI [JP], et al);
 [XY]US5834893  (BULOVIC VLADIMIR [US], et al)
International search[Y]JPH0854836  (NEC CORP);
 [Y]JPH08124679  (IBM JAPAN, et al);
 [Y]JPH08213169  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [X]JPH10335068  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO);
 [Y]JPH118074  (MYATA SEIZO, et al);
 [Y]JPH1145780  (TDK CORP);
 [Y]JPH1174082  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [A]JPH1187062  (SEIKO EPSON CORP)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.