Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260288

EP1260288 - COLLECTED SAND PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2005  [2005/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SINTOKOGIO, LTD.
28-12, Meieki 3-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi 450-0002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Sintokogio, Ltd.
28-12, Meieki 3-chome, Nakamura-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Shigeaki, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
02 / MORI, Kuniyasu, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
03 / KANAYAMA, Ryoji, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, , Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 44 2-0061 / JP
04 / HARADA, Hisashi, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
05 / TOKITA, Hiroaki, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
06 / SUGIMOTO, Kazuo, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
07 / MATSUMOTO, Takehiko, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
08 / MAKINO, Hiroyasu, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
09 / YOSHIDA, Yasunori, c/o Sintokogio Ltd.
Toyokawa Seisakusyo, 1, Honohara 3-chome
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi 442-0061 / JP
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Röthinger, Rainer
c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date01906349.427.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001JP01461
Priority number, dateJP2000005686902.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000056869
JP2000006587810.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000065878
JP2000029773629.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000297736
[2002/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0164371
Date:07.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260288
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.09.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:B22C5/00, B22D29/00, B22C5/18
[2004/47]
Former International [2002/48]B22C5/00
Designated contracting statesDE [2004/22]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:WIEDERAUFARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR GUSSAND[2002/48]
English:COLLECTED SAND PROCESSING METHOD[2002/48]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SABLE COLLECTE[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2002Translation filed 
02.09.2002National basic fee paid 
02.09.2002Search fee paid 
02.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
02.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
01.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/11]
12.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS63317232  ;
 [X]US4620586  (MUSSCHOOT ALBERT [US]) [X] 1-6,27 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 8; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]DE2405113  (KLEIN ALB KG) [X] 1-6,27 * page 6, line 8 - page 7; claims 1-16 *;
 [X]US5167270  (HENYCH IVO [CH]) [X] 1-6,27 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]JPS59215243  ;
 [Y]US4620582  (MUELLER-SPAETH GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-6,27 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US5103578  (RICKARD ROBERT S [US]) [X] 2 * column 5, line 19 - line 51; claims 1-20,35 *;
 [A]US5163496  (JACOB HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-6,27 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4334574  (RENNIE ANDREW L, et al) [A] 1-6,27 * column 4, line 16 - line 21 *;
 [A]US4700766  (GODDERIDGE VOLKER [AT]) [A] 1-6,27 * column 2, line 13 - line 16 * * column 13, line 24 - line 31 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890414), vol. 0131, no. 54, Database accession no. (M - 814), [X] 1-6,27 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850417), vol. 0090, no. 87, Database accession no. (M - 372), [Y] 1-6,27 * abstract *
International search[X]US6030111  (TOKUYOSHI MINORU [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH11138252  (SINTOKOGIO LTD)