Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260853

EP1260853 - SURFACE LIGHT SOURCE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND APPARATUS USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2011Change - refusalpublished on 18.01.2012  [2012/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokouji-doori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, 600-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shinohara, Masayuki, c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
02 / Takagi, Junichi, c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
03 / Aoyama, Shigeru, c/o Omron Corporatoin
801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date01906361.927.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001JP01474
Priority number, dateJP2000005155428.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000051554
[2002/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0163347
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260853
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:F21V8/00, // (F21Y101/00, 103:00)
[2003/11]
Former International [2002/48]G02F1/1335, G02B6/00, F21V8/00, // (F21Y101/00, 103:00)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENLICHTQUELLE, DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND EIN DIESE VERWENDENDES GERÄT[2002/48]
English:SURFACE LIGHT SOURCE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND APPARATUS USING IT[2002/48]
French:SOURCE D'ECLAIRAGE DE SURFACE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET APPAREIL L'UTILISANT[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2002Translation filed 
02.09.2002National basic fee paid 
02.09.2002Search fee paid 
02.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
02.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
30.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/03]
25.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/12]
31.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/03]
31.10.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.11.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/12]
Divisional application(s)EP06022845.9  / EP1764547
EP06022846.7  / EP1762778
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH11120810  (ENPLAS CORP, et al);
 [A]JPH07270708  (ENPLAS CORP, et al);
 [A]JPH11231315  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JPH11258602  (ENPLAS CORP);
 [A]JPH11306831  (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS);
 [A]JPH112730  (ENPLAS CORP);
 [A]JPH11329039  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO);
 [A]JP2950219B  ;
 [A]JPH0981048  (BEAM DENSHI KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPH10311915  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
Examination US5961198
  US6086211
  JPH10283817
  US5594830