Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255957

EP1255957 - APPARATUS FOR DISCHARGING SHELLS FROM AN AMMUNITION MAGAZINE, AND A SHELL-DISCHARGING ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING TWO SUCH APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems Hägglunds Aktiebolag
891 82 Örnsköldsvik / SE
[2006/26]
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
Land Systems Hägglunds Aktiebolag
891 82 Örnsköldsvik / SE
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Hägglunds Vehicle AB
891 82 Örnsköldsvik / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ERIKSSON, Claes
Hornön 6422
S-891 96 Arnäsvall / SE
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Winblad, Hans Peter , et al
Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Winblad, Hans Peter , et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date01906472.415.02.2001
[2002/46]
WO2001SE00325
Priority number, dateSE2000000053518.02.2000         Original published format: SE 0000535
[2002/46]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0161266
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255957
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255957
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F41A9/00, F41A9/38
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON GESCHOSSEN AUS EINEM MAGAZIN UND LANDEVORRICHTUNG DIE ZWEI DIESER VORRICHTUNGEN HAT[2002/46]
English:APPARATUS FOR DISCHARGING SHELLS FROM AN AMMUNITION MAGAZINE, AND A SHELL-DISCHARGING ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING TWO SUCH APPARATUSES[2002/46]
French:APPAREIL DE DECHARGEMENT D'OBUS D'UN CHARGEUR DE MUNITIONS ET DISPOSITIF DE DECHARGEMENT D'OBUS POURVU DE DEUX DE CES APPAREILS[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase15.02.2001Translation filed 
13.07.2002National basic fee paid 
13.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
13.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
25.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2006Fee for grant paid
12.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
TR05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
IE15.02.2007
LU15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
IE15.02.2007
LU15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/19]NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
IE15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/10]NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
IE15.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/04]NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/48]IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/36]IT05.07.2006
NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/22]NL05.07.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/19]NL05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/12]SE05.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/10]SE05.10.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]SE217868  ;
 [A]FR688257  (ANCIENS ETS SAUTTER HARLE);
 [A]CH348895  (BOFORS AB [SE]);
 [A]DE3042675  (FICHT GMBH [DE])