blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1257962 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1257962



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 205
06.02.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.01.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
19.09.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
07.03.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
05.03.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
04.02.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.01.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 7
11.12.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
03.12.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 7
03.12.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
03.10.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
30.05.2003 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.05.2003 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.03.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.03.2003 Declaration that a search is not possible Search / examination 1
09.10.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.09.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
02.09.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.08.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
13.08.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.08.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.01.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
22.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 66
26.07.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.07.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
19.07.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 77