blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1257962


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.01.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  27.02.2008  [2008/09]
13.09.2007 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.03.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
07.02.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.06.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
04.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.03.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.02.2004 Change - representative published on  24.03.2004  [2004/13]
19.01.2004 Change - representative published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
21.03.2003 Supplementary search report published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
21.03.2003 Change - classification published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
01.02.2003 Renewal fee
04.10.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.11.2002  [2002/47]
04.10.2002 Request for examination filed published on  20.11.2002  [2002/47]
27.09.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2002 Change - extension states
19.08.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
24.07.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication