blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1257962
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO03052667Global Dossier 26.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
US2051201 18.12.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1257962Global Dossier 07.05.2003A4
EP1257962 20.11.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0101254 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3445601 24.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US0101254 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7139723 21.11.2006B2
US2002087967 04.07.2002A1
Priority number Date
US75964001 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7146329 05.12.2006B2
US2002133490 19.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
US2051201 18.12.2001
US75964001 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7194421 20.03.2007B2
US2003110109 12.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
US24184002 12.09.2002
US75964001 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7197472 27.03.2007B2
US2003105694 05.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
US75964001 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
US24184202 12.09.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7236941 26.06.2007B2
US2003149649 07.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
US75964001 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
US24184102 12.09.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7302419 27.11.2007B2
US2003105693 05.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
US75964001 16.01.2001
US24183302 12.09.2002
US17617700 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7383243 03.06.2008B2
US2003055759 20.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
US75964001 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
US16222202 05.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7739140 15.06.2010B2
US2003172374 11.09.2003A1
Priority number Date
US28206902 29.10.2002
US2051201 18.12.2001
US75964001 16.01.2001
US17617700 13.01.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0152173Global Dossier 19.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US17617700 13.01.2000