blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1257962

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
TR 
Examination procedure19.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/09]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2002National basic fee paid 
13.08.2002Search fee paid 
13.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200404   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2004
31.01.200707   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:20.11.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:20.11.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020813
 
Event date:20.11.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL PAYMENT 20020813;LT PAYMENT 20020813;LV PAYMENT 20020813;MK PAYMENT 20020813;RO PAYMENT 20020813;SI PAYMENT 20020813
 
Event date:07.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 06F 19/00 A
 
Event date:07.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 06F 17/60 B
 
Event date:07.05.2003 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030325
 
Event date:27.02.2008 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20070801