Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257962

EP1257962 - PRIVACY COMPLIANT MULTIPLE DATASET CORRELATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.02.2008  [2008/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erinmedia, Inc.
2509 63rd Avenue East
Bradenton, FL 34203 / US
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / CONKWRIGHT, George
7715 13th Avenue NW
Bradenton, FL 34209 / US
02 / VINSON, Michael
5017 Sturbridge Court
Sarasota, FL 34238 / US
03 / FOSTER, Frank
5905 Cherry Oak Drive
Valrico, FL 33594 / US
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Mittler, Enrico , et al
Mittler & C. S.r.l.
Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/13]Mittler, Enrico , et al
Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
Former [2004/10]Gatti, Enrico
Mittler & C. s.r.l. Via Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
Former [2002/47]Mittler, Enrico
c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date01906560.616.01.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001US01254
Priority number, dateUS20000176177P13.01.2000         Original published format: US 176177 P
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0152173
Date:19.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257962
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, G06F17/60
[2003/19]
Former International [2002/47]G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesAL13.08.2002
LT13.08.2002
LV13.08.2002
MK13.08.2002
RO13.08.2002
SI13.08.2002
TitleGerman:MEHRFACH-DATENSATZ-KORRELATIONSSYSTEM MIT PRIVACY-KOMPATIBILITÄT[2002/47]
English:PRIVACY COMPLIANT MULTIPLE DATASET CORRELATION SYSTEM[2002/47]
French:SYSTEME DE CORRELATION DE PLUSIEURS ENSEMBLES DE DONNEES RESPECTANT LA CONFIDENTIALITE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2002National basic fee paid 
13.08.2002Search fee paid 
13.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
01.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/09]
19.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200404   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2004
31.01.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
International search[A]US5861881  (FREEMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [A]US6134531  (TREWITT GLENN [US], et al)