Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254214

EP1254214 - HUMAN PROTEIN KINASES AND PROTEIN KINASE-LIKE ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2007
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sugen, Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/43]For all designated states
Sugen, Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York NY 10017 / US
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Sugen, Inc.
230 East Grand Avenue
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4811 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PLOWMAN, Gregory D.
35 Winding Way
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
02 / WHYTE, David
2623 Barclay Way
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
03 / MANNING, Gerard
844 Fremont Street No. 4
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / SUDARSANAM, Sucha
20 Corte Patencio
Greenbrae, CA 94904 / US
05 / MARTINEZ, Ricardo
984 Cartier Lane
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
 [2003/01]
Former [2002/45]01 / PLOWMAN, Gregory
4 Honeysuckle Lane
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
02 / WHYTE, David
2623 Barclay Way
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
03 / MANNING, Gerard
844 Fremont Street No. 4
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / SUDARSANAM, Sucha
20 Corte Patencio
Greenbrae, CA 94904 / US
05 / MARTINEZ, Ricardo
984 Cartier Lane
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Representative(s)Nobbe, Matthias
Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Nobbe, Matthias, Dr.
Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01906658.825.01.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001US02337
Priority number, dateUS20000178078P25.01.2000         Original published format: US 178078 P
US20000179364P31.01.2000         Original published format: US 179364 P
US20000183173P17.02.2000         Original published format: US 183173 P
US20000190162P17.03.2000         Original published format: US 190162 P
US20000193404P29.03.2000         Original published format: US 193404 P
US20000247013P13.11.2000         Original published format: US 247013 P
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0155356
Date:02.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254214
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HUMANE PROTEINKINASEN UND PROTEINKINASE-ÄHNLICHE ENZYME[2002/45]
English:HUMAN PROTEIN KINASES AND PROTEIN KINASE-LIKE ENZYMES[2002/45]
French:NOUVELLES PROTEINES KINASES HUMAINES ET ENZYMES SEMBLABLES AUX PROTEINES KINASES[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase23.08.2002National basic fee paid 
23.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
13.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/03]
29.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9949062  (GENE LOGIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * Application disclosing sequences with 71% identity with SEQ ID Nos:12 and 44 over 858 nucleotides and 289 amino amino acids respectively; page 37 - page 47; claims 2,14 *;
 [X]US5856463  (PRYDZ HANS PETER BLANKENBORG [NO], et al) [X] 1-28 * Discloses sequences with 69% identity to SEQ ID Nos:13 and 45 over 88 nucleotides and 317 amino acids respectively; column 19 - column 24 *;
 [PX]WO0063381  (SCIOS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-28 * Application disclosing SEQ ID Nos:3 and 6 with 99.9% and 99.6% identity with SEQ ID Nos: 14 and 46 over 4641 nucleotides and 1618 amino acids respectively; page 42 - page 57; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9958558  (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * Discloses SEQ ID NOs:1 and 14 with 95.7% and 92.7% identity with SEQ ID Nos: 7 and 59 over 1199 nucleotides and 399 amino acids respectively; page 63 - page 79; claims 1,9 *;
 [X]WO9953036  (SUGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * Discloses an STLK6 sequence with 96.2% identity with SEQ ID No:27 over 1199 nucleotides; page 361 - page 362 *;
 [X]  - DOE JOINT GENOME INSTITUTE, "Homo sapiens chroosome 5 clone CTC-255N20", DATABASE EMBL, (19991007), XP002173240 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - HANES J ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION BY CDNA CLONING OF TWO NEW HUMAN PROTEIN KINASES. EVIDENCE BY SEQUENCE COMPARISON OF A NEW FAMILY OF MAMMALIAN PROTEIN KINASES", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY,GB,LONDON, (1994), vol. 244, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 665 - 672, XP002064038 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1994.1763
 [A]  - SCHULTZ S J ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF 21 NOVEL HUMAN PROTEIN KINASES, INCLUDING 3 MEMBERS OF A FAMILY RELATED TO THE CELL CYCLE REGULATOR NIMA OF ASPERGILLUS NIDULANS", CELL GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION,XX,XX, (19931001), vol. 4, pages 821 - 830, XP000564042 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MEYERSON M ET AL, "A family of human cdc2-related protein kinases", EMBO JOURNAL,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, (1992), vol. 11, no. 8, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 2909 - 2917, XP002128265 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - KOEHRER K ET AL, "Homo sapiens mRNA", DATABASE EMBL, (19991216), XP002183476 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - BREDE G ET AL, "Serine/threonine-protein kinase-H1", DATABASE EMBL, (19891012), XP002183477 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - MARRA M ET AL, "vm45d02.y1 Stratagene mouse diaphragm Mus musculus cDNA clone", DATABASE EMBL, (19990426), XP002183478 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - TASSAN JP ET AL, "H. sapiens CAK mRNA for CDK-activating kinase", DATABASE EMBL, (19940510), XP002183479 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - TASSAN J-P ET AL, "Cell division protein kinase 7", DATABASE EMBL, (19961001), XP002183480 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - HANES, JJ ET AL, "Protein Kinase CLK2", DATABASE EMBL, (19961001), XP002183481 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - SULSTON JE ET AL, "Homo sapiens BAC clone GS1-96J14 from 7p11.2-p21, complete sequence", DATABASE EMBL, (19981123), XP002183482 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - HANES JJ ET AL, "Homo sapiens clk2 mRNA, complete cds", DATABASE EMBL, (19950130), XP002183483 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - NCI-CGAP, "tx08c09.x1 NCI_CGAP_Ut4 Homo sapiens cDNA clone", DATABASE EMBL, (19990528), XP002183484 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - PEARCE A, "Human DNA sequence from clone 390O13 on chromosome Xp11", DATABASE EMBL, (19970122), XP002183485 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - BRAZAO, R ET AL, "Putative mitogen-activated protein kinase kinase kinase (fragment)", DATABASE EMBL, (19991101), XP002183486 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - HALL R, "Human DNA sequence from clone RP5-862P8 on chromosome 1q42.2-43", DATABASE EMBL, (19991208), XP002183487 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - DOROW DS ET AL, "Mitogen-activated protein kinase kinase kinase", DATABASE EMBL, (19940201), XP002183488 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - BIRREN B ET AL, "Homo sapiens chromosome 11 clone RP11-329B24 map 11", DATABASE EMBL, (19991122), XP002183489 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - HAUGE XY ET AL, "Homo sapiens dopamine D2 receptor gene", DATABASE EMBL, (19981102), XP002183490 [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - SAKANE F ET AL, "Homo sapiens mRNA for diacylglycerol kinase delta, compete cds.", DATABASE EMBL, (19960207), XP002183491 [X] 1,5 * abstract *