Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1251949 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1251949



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1552
25.01.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.01.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.01.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
05.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.01.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
05.01.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 2
05.01.2018 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
05.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.10.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
02.10.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
02.10.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
06.09.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 4
04.09.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.05.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.05.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.05.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.05.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 22
22.05.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 3
22.05.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.05.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.05.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
08.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Description Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
19.01.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
19.01.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Opposition 5
03.11.2016 Description Opposition 5
03.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.09.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
01.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.08.2016 Amended description with annotations Opposition 20
26.08.2016 Description Opposition 16
26.08.2016 Drawings Opposition 8
26.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.08.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
28.04.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
28.04.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.03.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
01.03.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.03.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.01.2016 Claims Appeal 2
28.01.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
28.01.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
05.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Authorisation Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Authorisation Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
28.12.2015 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Appeal 14
28.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 5
28.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 10
28.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 8
28.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 8
28.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 10
28.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 5
28.12.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 22
28.12.2015 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 22
21.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
21.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
21.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
21.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.12.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
17.12.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
27.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 3
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 4
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 3
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 4
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 4
20.11.2015 Claims Appeal 4
20.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.11.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
19.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
29.10.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
29.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.2015 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 1
20.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
19.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
11.08.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.07.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 12
29.06.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.06.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 26
16.07.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.07.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
16.07.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
16.07.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
16.07.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
16.07.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
12.07.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 26
29.04.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.04.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.04.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
22.01.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.01.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 55
18.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.12.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 28
18.12.2012 Claims Appeal 39
18.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
18.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
18.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 54
13.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2012 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Opposition 1
12.12.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
29.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.11.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
18.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
11.10.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
09.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.10.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 60
09.08.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
09.08.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
09.08.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.07.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
29.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.06.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
08.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.06.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 40
18.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
09.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
28.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.03.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.03.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2011 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Opposition 1
21.03.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
24.02.2011 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
15.02.2011 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
11.02.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
02.02.2011 Authorisation Opposition 1
02.02.2011 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
21.01.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
15.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.01.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
15.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
14.01.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
14.01.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
14.01.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.03.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.03.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
12.03.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
08.03.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
08.03.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
08.03.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
17.02.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.10.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.10.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.10.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.10.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 39
15.10.2009 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
26.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
18.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
31.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.08.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
08.05.2007 Description Search / examination 4
08.05.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
08.05.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.05.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
02.05.2007 Description Search / examination 4
02.05.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
02.05.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.03.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.02.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.2006 Description Search / examination 23
14.03.2006 Description Search / examination 23
14.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.01.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.01.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.09.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.09.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
22.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
22.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
17.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
17.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.04.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
20.04.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.01.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.11.2002 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.11.2002 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.09.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.09.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
30.08.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.08.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.07.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
02.07.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
28.06.2002 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
31.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 46
10.08.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.08.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.08.2001 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 41
08.03.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.03.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 5
08.03.2001 Description International Searching Authority 27
08.03.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 8
08.03.2001 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1