Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257467

EP1257467 - IMPROVED AEROBATIC AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wadleigh, John
4841 E. Salida Del Sol Place
Tucson, AZ 85718 / US
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2002/47]Gervasi, Gemma, Dr.
NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date01906811.331.01.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001US03119
Priority number, dateUS2000049471031.01.2000         Original published format: US 494710
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154978
Date:02.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257467
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257467
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:B64D33/00, B64C39/04, B64D27/10, F01M11/06, F16N7/38, B64D27/08
[2006/08]
Former International [2002/47]B64D33/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RO28.08.2002
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES KUNSTFLUGZEUG[2002/47]
English:IMPROVED AEROBATIC AIRCRAFT[2002/47]
French:AVION DE VOLTIGE PERFECTIONNE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2002National basic fee paid 
28.08.2002Search fee paid 
28.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
11.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2007Fee for grant paid
15.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
GB31.01.2008
IE31.01.2008
IT31.01.2008
LU31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
GB31.01.2008
IE31.01.2008
LU31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
Former [2010/32]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
GB31.01.2008
IE31.01.2008
LU31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
Former [2009/33]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
GB31.01.2008
IE31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
Former [2009/08]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
GB31.01.2008
IE31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
Former [2009/04]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
GB31.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
Former [2008/40]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
Former [2008/28]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/26]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/23]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/19]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/13]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/09]NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/08]ES12.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2678783  (FRANCIS MYERS GEORGE) [X] 1-7,10-16 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 3 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 17;
 [Y]US1538801  (HALL RANDOLPH F) [Y] 17 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4012012  (LIGLER GEORGE E) [A] 8,9 * abstract *;
 [A]US4531358  (SMITH STANLEY [GB]) [A] 8,9 * abstract *;
 [A]US2140783  (BELLANCA FRANK M) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
International search[A]USD97652S  ;
 [Y]USD130651S  ;
 [Y]USD239522S  ;
 [Y]US4531358  (SMITH STANLEY [GB]);
 [Y]US5086993  (WAINFAN BARNABY [US]);
 [Y]US5520355  (JONES JACK M [US]);
 [A]US5782427  (HERMACH CARL J [US])