Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259381

EP1259381 - EXPANDABLE AND CONTRACTIBLE KEYBOARD WITH ADJUSTABLE KEY SIZES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2013
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2013  [2013/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.A.S.T. Associates
25th floor, 111 West Ocean Boulevard
Long Beach, CA 90801-9931 / US
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / LAHR, Roy, J.
944 Hammond Street
Los Angeles, CA 90069-4407 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date01906887.301.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001US03349
Priority number, dateUS20000178936P01.02.2000         Original published format: US 178936 P
US2000055886626.04.2000         Original published format: US 558866
US20000221114P27.07.2000         Original published format: US 221114 P
US20000233965P20.09.2000         Original published format: US 233965 P
US20000255295P13.12.2000         Original published format: US 255295 P
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0156803
Date:09.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259381
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B41J5/08
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2004/22]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUS-UNDEINZIEHBARE TASTATUR MIT VERSTELLBARE TASTERGROSSE[2002/48]
English:EXPANDABLE AND CONTRACTIBLE KEYBOARD WITH ADJUSTABLE KEY SIZES[2002/48]
French:CLAVIER EXTENSIBLE ET CONTRACTABLE AVEC DIMENSION DE TOUCHES REGLABLE[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2002National basic fee paid 
30.08.2002Search fee paid 
30.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
31.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/07]
06.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200606   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.2006
28.02.200707   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2007
29.02.200808   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2008
28.02.200909   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2009
28.05.201210   M02   Not yet paid
28.05.201211   M02   Not yet paid
28.05.201212   M02   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5141343  (ROYLANCE WILLIAM H [US], et al);
 [Y]US5982612  (ROYLANCE WILLIAM H [US]);
 [XP]US6151012  (BULLISTER EDWARD [US]);
 [X]US5995025  (STERNGLASS DANIEL I [US], et al);
 [A]US5951178  (LIM BYUNG-GUL [KR]);
 [A]US5439304  (PHILLIPS MICHAEL [US], et al)