EP1257489 - SELF ALIGNING TRANSPORT MECHANISM FOR MEDIA OF VARIABLE MEDIA WIDTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crane Payment Innovations, Inc. 3222 Phoenixville Pike, Suite 200 Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2019/08] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states MEI, Inc. 3222 Phoenixville Pike Suite 200 Malvern, PA 19355 / US | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states MEI, Inc. 1301 Wilson Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Mars Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAOUT, Jerome Route de St.Cerque 40B CH-1260 Nyon / CH | 02 /
NUNN, Mike 507 North Walnut Street West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 03 /
CLAUSER, Robert 3 Holly Drive Columbus, NJ 08022 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Brinck, David John Borchardt, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/47] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01906899.8 | 02.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US03384 | Priority number, date | US20000181307P | 09.02.2000 Original published format: US 181307 P | US20010769173 | 25.01.2001 Original published format: US 769173 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0158790 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257489 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257489 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1257489 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/06, B65H27/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B65H5/062 (EP,US);
B65H27/00 (EP,US);
B65H2301/331 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1116 (EP,US);
B65H2404/133 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1412 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2019/09] |
Former [2004/20] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTAUSRICHTENDE TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG FÜR BÖGEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN BREITEN | [2002/47] | English: | SELF ALIGNING TRANSPORT MECHANISM FOR MEDIA OF VARIABLE MEDIA WIDTHS | [2002/47] | French: | MECANISME DE TRANSPORT À AUTO-ALIGNEMENT POUR SUPPORT DE FEUILLES DE LARGEURS VARIABLES | [2011/16] |
Former [2002/47] | MECANISME DE TRANSPORT AUTO-ALIGNE POUR SUPPORT DE LARGEURS VARIABLES | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2003 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.2012
09.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Eder, Christian Kurfürstenstraße 14 80801 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.2012
09.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Eder, Christian Kurfürstenstrasse 14 80801 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.2012
09.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Eder, Christian Kurfürstenstrasse 14 80801 München / DE Opponent's representative Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch KSNH Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.2012
09.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Eder, Christian Kurfürstenstrasse 14 80801 München / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Christian Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | 06.09.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.11.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.04.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.01.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.06.2014 | Appeal received No. T1293/14 | 03.09.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.04.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 13.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 05.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2006 | Decision despatched | 17.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 03.11.2006 | ID: | 02 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 02.08.2007 | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/07] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Date: | 03.11.2006 | ||
[2007/50] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.03.2015 | IT | 02.02.2016 | ES | 03.02.2016 | GB | 02.02.2019 | [2020/11] |
Former [2017/38] | FR | 02.03.2015 | |
IT | 02.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | FR | 02.03.2015 | |
IT | 02.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/12] | FR | 02.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2317881 (MARS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-13,21-25 * page 7, line 9 - line 26 * * page 13, line 22 - page 14, line 16 * * page 15, line 2 - line 17 * * figures 2,8 *; | [X]EP0848357 (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,12,21-23 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 42; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US5582399 (SUGIURA TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1-8,17 * column 3, line 1 - line 42 * * column 7, line 28 - line 29 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]GB1447888 (XEROX CORP) [X] 1,3,4,7 * page 2, line 84 - line 90 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4918463 (PIATT MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,11,12,17 * the whole document *; | [PX]US6149150 (ONIPCHENKO OLEKSANDR [UA], et al) [PX] 1,2,21,23-25 * column 3, line 19 - line 44 * * figure 2 * |