Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259579

EP1259579 - FUNCTIONAL FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALEXANDER, Albert, Gordon
1101 Cathcart Blvd.
Sarnia, Ontario N7S 2H4 / CA
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Troch, Geneviève
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Troch, Geneviève
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date01907017.606.02.2001
[2002/48]
WO2001US03790
Priority number, dateUS20000181138P08.02.2000         Original published format: US 181138 P
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0159038
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1259579
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1259579
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:C10M101/02, // (C10M101/02, 101:02, 101:02)
[2003/20]
Former International [2002/48]C10M101/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONELLE FLÜSSIGKEIT[2002/48]
English:FUNCTIONAL FLUID[2002/48]
French:FLUIDE FONCTIONNEL[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2002National basic fee paid 
06.09.2002Search fee paid 
06.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
21.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2004Fee for grant paid
01.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
TR08.12.2004
CY06.02.2005
LU06.02.2005
IE07.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
PT08.05.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/20]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
TR08.12.2004
CY06.02.2005
LU06.02.2005
IE07.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2007/10]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
TR08.12.2004
LU06.02.2005
IE07.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/51]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
TR08.12.2004
IE07.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/23]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
IE07.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
MC28.02.2005
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI08.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5520832  (ALEXANDER ALBERT G [CA]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 15; table 2 *;
 [A]US4968452  (SEIKI HIROMICHI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 10, line 43 - line 53; tables 1-3 *;
 [A]US4299714  (SUGIURA KENSUKE, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 5 - line 23; tables 1,2 *
International search[YE]US6187725  (KRAMER DAVID C [US], et al);
 [YP]US6110879  (KRAMER DAVID C [US], et al);
 [Y]US3915871  (BRYER ROBERT P, et al);
 [A]US5344582  (UMEMOTO NOBORU [JP], et al);
 [A]US5321172  (ALEXANDER A GORDON [CA], et al);
 [A]US5167847  (OLAVESEN CHRISTOPHER [CA], et al);
 [A]US5064546  (DASAI MASASHI [JP]);
 [A]US4717489  (SCHIEMAN RICHARD D [US])