Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254346

EP1254346 - COMPOSITE HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING STRENGTHENED JOINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07960 / US
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Avenue, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, Alexander, F.
26023 Marina Drive
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date01907107.508.02.2001
[2002/45]
WO2001US04023
Priority number, dateUS2000050025008.02.2000         Original published format: US 500250
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0159386
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254346
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254346
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F28F21/02, F28D9/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:VERBUNDWÄRMETAUSCHER MIT VERSTÄRKTEN VERBINDUNGEN[2002/45]
English:COMPOSITE HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING STRENGTHENED JOINTS[2002/45]
French:ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE COMPOSITE A JOINTS RENFORCES[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2002National basic fee paid 
29.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
04.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2004Fee for grant paid
23.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR20.10.2004
TR20.10.2004
AT08.02.2005
CY08.02.2005
FI08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
PT08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
[2009/42]
Former [2008/29]GR20.10.2004
AT08.02.2005
CY08.02.2005
FI08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
PT08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2008/23]GR20.10.2004
AT08.02.2005
CY08.02.2005
FI08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2007/10]AT08.02.2005
CY08.02.2005
FI08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/34]AT08.02.2005
CY08.02.2005
FI08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/23]CY08.02.2005
FI08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/14]CY08.02.2005
FI08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/13]FI08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
DK28.02.2005
Former [2005/52]FI08.02.2005
SE09.02.2005
Former [2005/50]SE09.02.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9425178  (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 21 - page 10, line 12; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US5980665  (CHILDRESS JAMES J [US]) [A] 1 * column 12, line 65 - column 14, line 20; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4528051  (HEINZE FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4331495  (LACKMAN LESLIE M, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 - column 6, line 59; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US4015035  (BLAD LEIV H, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-7 *;
 [DA]WO9730321  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5542471  (DICKINSON RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - column 8, line 50; figures 1-14 *
by applicantUS5628363
 US19960601754