blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1309348

EP1309348 - PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST VACCINIA VIRUS ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.11.2009
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
U.S. Army Medical Research Institute of Infectious Diseases; Department of the Army
504 Scott Street
Frederick, MD 21702 / US
[2009/02]
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
U.S. Army Medical Research Institute of Infectious Diseases Department of the Army
504 Scott Street
Frederick, MD 21702 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOOPER, Jay, W.
6522 Twin Lake Drive
New Market, MD 21774 / US
02 / SCHMALJOHN, Alan, L.
7613 Irongate Lane
Frederick, MD 21702 / US
03 / SCHMALJOHN, Connie, S.
7613 Irongate Lane
Frederick, MD 21702 / US
 [2003/20]
Representative(s)Smyth, Gyles Darren
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Smyth, Gyles Darren
Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date01907203.209.02.2001
[2003/20]
WO2001US04520
Priority number, dateUS20000182066P11.02.2000         Original published format: US 182066 P
[2003/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0158485
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1309348
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1309348
Date:07.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/42, A61P31/20, // C07K16/08
[2003/20]
CPC:
C07K16/081 (EP,US); A61P31/20 (EP); A61K2039/505 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORBEUGENDE UND THERAPEUTSCHE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN VACCINIAVIRUSANTIGENE[2003/20]
English:PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST VACCINIA VIRUS ANTIGENS[2003/20]
French:ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX A VOCATION PROPHYLACTIQUE ET THERAPEUTIQUE CONTRE VACCINIA VIRUS ANTIGENE[2003/20]
Entry into regional phase30.12.2002National basic fee paid 
30.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/20]
05.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2008
05.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.09.2008Fee for grant paid
24.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.12.2002AT   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002BE   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002CH   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002CY   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002ES   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002FI   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002GB   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002IE   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002LU   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002MC   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002NL   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002PT   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002SE   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
30.12.2002TR   M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.12.2002M01   Fee paid on   30.12.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
CY07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
IT07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
TR07.01.2009
LU09.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR09.03.2009
SE07.04.2009
GR08.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
DE01.09.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
IT07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
LU09.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR09.03.2009
SE07.04.2009
GR08.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
DE01.09.2009
Former [2011/14]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
IT07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR09.03.2009
SE07.04.2009
GR08.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
DE01.09.2009
Former [2010/47]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR09.03.2009
SE07.04.2009
GR08.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
DE01.09.2009
Former [2010/21]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR09.03.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
DE01.09.2009
Former [2010/09]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
DE01.09.2009
Former [2009/47]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
Former [2009/46]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
DK07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
Former [2009/43]AT07.01.2009
BE07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
Former [2009/42]AT07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
Former [2009/40]AT07.01.2009
FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
Former [2009/37]FI07.01.2009
NL07.01.2009
SE07.04.2009
ES18.04.2009
PT08.06.2009
Former [2009/33]NL07.01.2009
ES18.04.2009
Former [2009/26]NL07.01.2009
Cited inInternational search[XY]  - HOOPER J W ET AL, "DNA vaccination with vaccinia virus L1R and A33R genes protects mice against a lethal poxvirus challenge.", VIROLOGY., (20000120), vol. 266, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 329 - 339, XP002175484 [X] 1-4,6-17 * the whole document * [Y] 5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1999.0096
 [XY]  - GALMICHE MARIE C ET AL, "Neutralizing and protective antibodies directed against vaccinia virus envelope antigens.", VIROLOGY, (19990201), vol. 254, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 71 - 80, XP002175485 [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1998.9516
 [X]  - ICHIHASHI YASUO ET AL, "Neutralizing epitope on penetration protein of vaccinia virus.", VIROLOGY, (1996), vol. 220, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 491 - 494, XP002175486 [X] 1,2 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1996.0337
 [X]  - ROPER R L ET AL, "EXTRACELLULAR VACCINIA VIRUS ENVELOPE GLYCOPROTEIN ENCODED BY THE A33R GENE", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY,US,THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, (199606), vol. 70, no. 6, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 3753 - 3762, XP002911795 [X] 1,3 * abstract *
 [T]  - LAW MANSUN ET AL, "Antibody neutralization of the extracellular enveloped form of vaccinia virus.", VIROLOGY, (200102), vol. 280, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 132 - 142, XP002175487 [T] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2000.0750
Examination   - HOOPER J.W. ET AL, "Four-gene-combination DNA vaccine protects mice against a lethal vaccinia virus challenge and elicits appropriate antibody responses in nonhuman primates", VIROLOGY, (2003), vol. 306, doi:doi:10.1016/S0042-6822(02)00038-7, pages 181 - 195, XP002432487

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0042-6822(02)00038-7
    - LUSTIG S. ET AL, "Combinations of polyclonal or monoclonal antibodies to proteins of the outer membranes of the two infectious forms of vaccinia virus protect mice against a lethal respiratory challenge", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200511), vol. 79, no. 21, doi:doi:10.1128/JVI.79.21.13454-13462.2005, pages 13454 - 13462, XP002627907

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.79.21.13454-13462.2005
    - MOHAMMED RAFFI-EL-IDRISSI BENHNIA ET AL, "Redundancy and plasticity of neutralizing antibody responses are cornerstone attributes of the human immune response to the smallpox vaccine", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200804), vol. 82, no. 7, pages 3751 - 3768
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.